United States of America v. $36,800 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $36,800 in United States Currency
Claimant: Obah Pope
Case Number: 4:2019cv02153
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 VERIFIED ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND byObah Pope. (Lentz, Jacek) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 06/06/19. (Proof of Publication of Notice of Forfeiture Action) (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 CLAIM Claim Opposing Forfeiture byObah Pope. (Lentz, Jacek) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #7 Clerk's Notice, (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE MOVING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ONE WEEK. Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. The 8/12/19 Case Management Conference date is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #5 Proposed Warrant, #1 Complaint, #4 Notice (Other), Warrant Issued (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 2, 2019 WARRANT ISSUED for arrest of property in rem: as to $36,800 in United States Currency. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America (Notice of Forfeiture Action) (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem) against $36,800 in United States Currency. Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 4/22/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $36,800 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $36,800 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Karen D. Beausey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Obah Pope
Represented By: Jacek W Lentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?