City of Fullerton et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: city of fullerton, The People of the State of California, by and through Fullerton City Attorney Richard D. Jones and The People of the State of California
Defendant: Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., ORTHO- MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Kathe Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Insys Therapeutics Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Theresa Sackler, Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., David A. Sackler, TEVA Pharmaceuticals, USA Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Allergan plc, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Jonathan D. Sackler, Richard S Sackler, Irene Sackler Lefcourt, Allergan Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Allergan USA, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Parmaceuticals, Inc., Kath A. Sackler and Allergan Finance, LLC
Not Classified By Court: California Attorney General's Office
Case Number: 4:2019cv02321
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Receipt of Transferred from USDC-Northern Ohio. The case no. is 1:19-op-45732. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 24 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to USDC-Northern Ohio. Signed by Sarah S. Vance. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Insys Therapeutics Inc. OF BANKRUPTCY COURTS ORDER PARTIALLY STAYING CASE (Azlin, Kristina) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by California Attorney General's Office (Burkart, Michiyo) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER STAYING ACTIONS PENDING JPML ACTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar.Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-02307-JST, 3:19-cv-02320-JST, 3:19-cv-02321-JST, 3:19-cv-02323-JST, 3:19-cv-02324-JST, 3:19-cv-02325-JST, 3:19-cv-02326-JST(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 6/13/2019. Replies due by 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Endo Health Solutions Inc and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Motion for Tiffany M. Ikeda to Withdraw as Counsel)(Lombardo, John) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 19 Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RELATING CASE 19-cv-2307-JST to 19-cv-02320-PJH,19-cv-02321-JD,19-cv-02323-RS,19-cv-02324-JST, 19-cv-02325-JD, 19-cv-02326-JSW. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 16, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by The People of the State of California re #11 Request for Judicial Notice, #10 MOTION to Remand ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof Amended Notice of Motion to Remand (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand)(Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by McKesson Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 5/23/2019. Replies due by 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth In Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/9/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 05/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice re #10 MOTION to Remand ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byCity of Fullerton, The People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by City of Fullerton, The People of the State of California. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 5/20/2019. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of Fullerton, The People of the State of California.. (Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, ORTHO- MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA Pharmaceuticals, USA Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The People of the State of California and City of Fullerton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER FOR JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION)(Neglia, Ashley) (Filed on 5/6/2019) Modified on 5/7/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Elizabeth Neglia on behalf of Allergan USA, Inc. (Neglia, Ashley) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint filed by McKesson Corporation and City Of Costa Mesa And The People Of The State Of California , Cardinal Health, Inc. , Amerisourcebergen Corporation , Richard S. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, Theresa Sackler, David A. Sackler, And Richard S. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, And Beverly Sackler, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. , Endo Health Solutions Inc. And Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. And Insys Therapeutics, Inc. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/3/2019) Modified on 5/6/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by McKesson Corporation (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (No Process) from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-574867. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13301370). Filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 4/29/2019) Modified on 4/30/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Fullerton et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Jae Hong Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO- MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: Jae Hong Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Represented By: Kristina Starr Azlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Jae Hong Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Nathan E. Shafroth
Represented By: Rebecca Grace Van Tassell
Represented By: Raymond Gin Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: John David Lombardo
Represented By: Tiffany M. Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Collie Fitch James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals, USA Inc.
Represented By: Collie Fitch James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Collie Fitch James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Collie Fitch James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Collie Fitch James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: John David Lombardo
Represented By: Tiffany M. Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Steven J. Boranian
Represented By: Sarah Barr Johansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Collie Fitch James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Parmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kath A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: city of fullerton
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Melissa Miles Ballard
Represented By: Richard D. Jones
Represented By: Michael A. Geibelson
Represented By: Roman M. Silberfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of California, by and through Fullerton City Attorney Richard D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of California
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Melissa Miles Ballard
Represented By: Richard D. Jones
Represented By: Michael A. Geibelson
Represented By: Roman M. Silberfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: California Attorney General's Office
Represented By: Michiyo Michelle Burkart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?