Mesa Digital, LLC v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: MESA DIGITAL, LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02403
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 8/26/2019 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Shu Zhang. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/31/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13397209.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Zhang, Shu) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Apple Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Winnard, Douglas) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc... (Winnard, Douglas) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Winnard, Douglas) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Frederick Baum (Baum, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Pieja (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Jordan Winnard (Winnard, Douglas) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/4/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/16/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by MESA DIGITAL, LLC (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by MESA DIGITAL, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Dynamic IP Deals LLC for MESA DIGITAL, LLC. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13312081). Filed by Mesa Digital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 5/2/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mesa Digital, LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Jordan Winnard
Represented By: Shu Zhang
Represented By: Kenneth Frederick Baum
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pieja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MESA DIGITAL, LLC
Represented By: Todd Christopher Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?