Tabak et al v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Casillas, De'Jhontai Banks, David Danon, Nestor Trujillo, Matthew White, Kelly Camelo-Cenicola, Lisa Tabak and Brianna Castelli
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02455
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by V Chai Oliver Prentice (Prentice, V) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
November 25, 2019 Filing 57 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) The case management conference previously set for 12/17/19 is continued. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #37 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2020 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 55 ****PLEASE DISREGARD. ENTERED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DKT. 56**** CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Set/Reset Deadlines as to #37 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2019 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019) Modified on 11/22/2019 (mllS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE re #53 Order, Terminate Hearings Defendant Apple Inc.'s Response to Order Vacating Hearing by Apple, Inc.. (Amezcua, Alexandria) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #37 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 6, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to William Ladnier.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13856311.) filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Kelly Camelo-Cenicola, Brianna Castelli, David Danon, Lisa Tabak, Nestor Trujillo, Matthew White. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ladnier, William) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY (re #37 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byApple, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
September 23, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lisa A. White.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 48 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #37 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byDe'Jhontai Banks, Kelly Camelo-Cenicola, Joseph Casillas, Brianna Castelli, David Danon, Lisa Tabak, Nestor Trujillo, Matthew White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lisa Tabak In Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of De'Jhontai Banks In Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of David Danon In Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Brianna Castelli In Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Matthew White In Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Kelly Camelo-Cenicola In Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Njestor Trujillo In Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Coleman, Gregory) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEIn light of the pending motion to dismiss the first amended complaint, ECF No. 37, the case management conference currently scheduled for September 24, 2019 is CONTINUED to December 17, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. An updated joint case management statement is due December 10, 2019.Discovery is stayed until the Court rules on the motion to dismiss. If any claims survive that motion, discovery will commence upon issuance of the Court's ruling regardless of whether other claims are dismissed with leave to amend. If all claims are dismissed, whether with or without prejudice, discovery will remain stayed. Once discovery commences, it will not be bifurcated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13725890.) filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Kelly Camelo-Cenicola, Joseph Casillas, Brianna Castelli, David Danon, Lisa Tabak, Nestor Trujillo, Matthew White. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(White, Lisa) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 45 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Kelly Camelo-Cenicola, Brianna Castelli, David Danon, Lisa Tabak, Nestor Trujillo, Matthew White and Apple, Inc. (Gold, Andrea) (Filed on 9/17/2019) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2019 Filing 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by De'Jhontai Banks, Kelly Camelo-Cenicola, Joseph Casillas, Brianna Castelli, David Danon, Lisa Tabak, Nestor Trujillo, Matthew White (Gold, Andrea) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #41 Stipulation selecting Private ADR.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 42 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiffs (Glaspie, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 41 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Apple, Inc. filed by Apple, Inc., Matthew White, Nestor Trujillo, Lisa Tabak, David Danon, Brianna Castelli, Kelly Camelo-Ceniola, De'Jhontai Banks. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/4/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2019 Filing 40 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 38 Request for Judicial Notice re #37 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #37 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/23/2019. Replies due by 10/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexis Amezcua, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Penelope Athene Preovolos on Behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Arturo J. Gonzalez on Behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 34 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019:Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for Monday, 9/23/19 has been reset for Tuesday, 9/24/2019 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER EXTENDING RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DEADLINES by Judge Jon S. Tigar. Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Casillas (Gold, Andrea) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 30 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendant Apple, Inc.. Filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Lisa Tabak, Matthew White, Kelly Camelo-Cenicola, David Danon, Brianna Castelli, Nestor Trujillo. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Collective Exhibit A - Declarations)(Coleman, Gregory) (Filed on 7/25/2019) Modified on 7/26/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2019 Filing 29 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending Rule 26(F) Conference And Case Management Deadlines filed by Apple, Inc.. (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO EXTENDDEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDEDCOMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar. Amended Complaint due by 7/26/2019. Response to Amended Complaint due by 8/26/2019. Replies due by 10/14/2019. Responses due by 9/23/2019.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Leave to File First Amended Complaint and to Extend Defendant Apple Inc.'s Time to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. (Amezcua, Alexandria) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Lanahan. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrea R. Gold. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13454425) filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas. (Lanahan, Matthew) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13454351) filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas. (Gold, Andrea) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Adam A. Edwards. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory F. Coleman. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Adam A. Edwards, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13445528) filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Edwards, Adam) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Gregory F. Coleman, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13445525) filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey H. Glaspie. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey H. Glaspie, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13436921) filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Glaspie, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant Apple Inc.'s Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. (Amezcua, Alexandria) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Leonard Robinson (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Armida Amezcua (Amezcua, Alexandria) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Initiating Documents served on Apple Inc. on 05/10/2019, filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due 8/7/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2019 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 05/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/21/19. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/21/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas.. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/21/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Apple, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13322838.). Filed by Joseph Casillas, De'Jhontai Banks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 5/6/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tabak et al v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandria Armida Amezcua
Represented By: Christopher Leonard Robinson
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Represented By: Arturo J. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Casillas
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Matthew David Schelkopf
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Glaspie
Represented By: Joseph Bryce Kenney
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Matthew William Lanahan
Represented By: Lisa A White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De'Jhontai Banks
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Matthew David Schelkopf
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Glaspie
Represented By: Joseph Bryce Kenney
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Matthew William Lanahan
Represented By: V Chai Oliver Prentice
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Danon
Represented By: Matthew David Schelkopf
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Glaspie
Represented By: Joseph Bryce Kenney
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Matthew William Lanahan
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: V Chai Oliver Prentice
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nestor Trujillo
Represented By: Matthew David Schelkopf
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Glaspie
Represented By: Joseph Bryce Kenney
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Matthew William Lanahan
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: V Chai Oliver Prentice
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew White
Represented By: Matthew David Schelkopf
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Glaspie
Represented By: Joseph Bryce Kenney
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Matthew William Lanahan
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: V Chai Oliver Prentice
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Camelo-Cenicola
Represented By: Matthew David Schelkopf
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Glaspie
Represented By: Joseph Bryce Kenney
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Matthew William Lanahan
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: V Chai Oliver Prentice
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Tabak
Represented By: Matthew David Schelkopf
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Glaspie
Represented By: Joseph Bryce Kenney
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Matthew William Lanahan
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: V Chai Oliver Prentice
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Castelli
Represented By: Matthew David Schelkopf
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Glaspie
Represented By: Joseph Bryce Kenney
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Matthew William Lanahan
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: V Chai Oliver Prentice
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?