Weinstein v. Wrixon
Plaintiff: Marlene G. Weinstein
Defendant: Ann Wrixon
Case Number: 4:2019cv02484
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Withdrawal of and Taking Off Calendar re #1 Withdrawal of Reference by Ann Wrixon (Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 5/23/2019) Modified on 5/24/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FOLLOW INSTRUCTIONS IN CLERKS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/21/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to Counsel re: Notice of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 Withdrawal of Bankruptcy Reference Upon Order of the Court Bankruptcy Court Oakland case number 17-40327/AP 19-4010. Filed by Ann Wrixon. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Motion, #3 Memorandum, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinstein v. Wrixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene G. Weinstein
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Fillerup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Wrixon
Represented By: Donald Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?