Ghadiri v. Rampur et al

Plaintiff: Adam Ghadiri
Defendant: Sujata K. Rampur, Kallapa G. Rampur and SKRR Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv02675
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Ghadiri. SKRR Corporation served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Ghadiri. Sujata K. Rampur served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Ghadiri. Kallapa G. Rampur served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adam Ghadiri.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kallapa G. Rampur, Sujata K. Rampur, SKRR Corporation. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Adam Ghadiri re #1 Complaint, (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13357502.). Filed byAdam Ghadiri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 5/17/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghadiri v. Rampur et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Ghadiri
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Chris Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sujata K. Rampur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kallapa G. Rampur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKRR Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?