In re Lyft Inc. Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: Matias Malig, as Trustee for the Malig Family Trust
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Brian Roberts, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Jefferies LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Castleoak Securities, L.P., JMP Securities LLC, David Lawee, Valerie Jarrett, Lyft, Inc., Penserra Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Academy Securities, Inc., Logan Green, Mary Agnes Wilderotter, Siebert Cisneros Shank & Co., L.L.C., Great Pacific Securities, UBS Securities LLC, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., John Zimmer, Evercore Group L.L.C., Drexel Hamilton, LLC, R. Seelaus & Co., LLC, Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc., Hiroshi Mikitani, Canaccord Genuity LLC, Blaylock Van, LLC, Prashant Aggarwal, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Ben Horowitz, Ann Miura-Ko, Cowen and Company, LLC, Tigress Financial Partners LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, KKR Capital Markets, LLC, Jonathan Christodoro, Mary Agnes (Maggie) Wilderotter and Prashant (Sean) Aggarwal
Petitioner: Harold Tholen, Deep Dinesh Patel, Rakesh Khanna, Terry S. Bradford, Rick Keiner and Danilo Nunez
Case Number: 4:2019cv02690
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 60 CLERK'S NOTICE Re Docket Nos. #9 , #12 , #16 and #20 . Notice is hereby given that the Court takes the pending motions filings under submission. The hearings previously scheduled for December 12th at 2:00 p.m. are vacated. The Court will issue a written order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 9, 2019 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Whitney E. Street on behalf of Rick Keiner (Street, Whitney) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 9, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney E. Street (Street, Whitney) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 57 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Siebert Cisneros Shank & Co., L.L.C., The Williams Capital Group, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Shank Williams Cisneros, LLC for Siebert Cisneros Shank & Co., L.L.C., The Williams Capital Group, L.P. (Shimada, Charlene) (Filed on 12/5/2019) Modified on 12/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2019 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearings on the ( #9 , #12 , #16 , #20 ) motions to appoint lead plaintiff and lead counsel and motions to consolidate cases, previously set for November 21, 2019, are continued to December 12, 2019 before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 to change "is' to "are" (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2019 Filing 55 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byRakesh Khanna, Danilo Nunez, Harold Tholen. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 54 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byRick Keiner. (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Susan E. Engel. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 52 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #9 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byRakesh Khanna, Danilo Nunez, Harold Tholen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harold Tholen, #2 Declaration of Danilo Nunez, #3 Declaration of Rakesh Khanna)(McCall, Adam) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 51 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byRick Keiner. (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 50 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct Event is "Statement." Event can be found under Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Other Documents > Statement.Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #49 Amended Document filed by Rick Keiner (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 49 Supplemental Statement re Regarding Keiner's PSLRA Certification by Rick Keiner. (Attachments: #1 Amended Certification)(Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 7/29/2019) Modified on 7/30/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Susan E. Engel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13556842.) filed by Prashant (Sean) Aggarwal, Jonathan Christodoro, Logan Green, Ben Horowitz, Valerie Jarrett, David Lawee, Lyft, Inc., Hiroshi Mikitani, Ann Miura-Ko, Brian Roberts, Mary Agnes (Maggie) Wilderotter, John Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Engel, Susan) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (Docket Nos.46 in case 4:19-cv-02690-HSG and 37 in case 4:19-cv-03003-HSG) Renewed JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consolidate Cases. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 46 Renewed JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consolidate Cases filed by Rick Keiner, Matias Malig, as Trustee for the Malig Family Trust, Terry S. Bradford, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer, Brian Roberts, Prashant (Sean) Aggarwal, Academy Securities, Inc., Academy Securities, Inc., Castleoak Securities, L.P., Canaccord Genuity LLC., C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC., Cowen and Company, LLC., Drexel Hamilton, LLC., Ben Horowitz, Local Gree, Great Pacific Securities, Evercore Group L.L.C., Valerie Jarrett, JMP Securities LLC., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC., KKR Capital Markets, LLC, Jefferies LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Hiroshi Mikitani, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, David Lawee, Ann Miura-Ko, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Penserra Securities LLC., R. Seelaus & Co., LLC., Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc., Siebert Cisneros Shank & Co., L.L.C., Stifel, Nicolus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Tigress Financial Partners LLC, UBS Securities, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC., and Mary Agnes (Maggie) Wilderotter. Responses due by 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/25/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/25/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2019 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 7/23/2019. Total Time in Court: 7 Minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: J. Hood. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Clubok; Adam McCall; Kevin Papay; Matthew Rawlinson; Stephen Shepardson; Charlene Shimada and Jacob Walker. The Court advises the parties that it will e-file by the close of business today proposed revised language for paragraph 2 of the parties proposed order consolidating cases. Parties are directed to e-file by the close business on July 25th either (a) a revised proposed order that includes the Courts revised language for paragraph 2 and a proposed case caption for paragraph 5; or (b) a joint objection to the Courts revised language. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/23/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Clubok. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Clubok ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13540965.) filed by Prashant (Sean) Aggarwal, Jonathan Christodoro, Logan Green, Ben Horowitz, Valerie Jarrett, David Lawee, Lyft, Inc., Hiroshi Mikitani, Ann Miura-Ko, Brian Roberts, Mary Agnes (Maggie) Wilderotter, John Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Shepardson, Stephen. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by Prashant (Sean) Aggarwal, Jonathan Christodoro, Logan Green, Ben Horowitz, Valerie Jarrett, David Lawee, Lyft, Inc., Hiroshi Mikitani, Ann Miura-Ko, Brian Roberts, Mary Agnes (Maggie) Wilderotter, John Zimmer identifying Other Affiliate Rakuten, Inc. for Ann Miura-Ko, Ben Horowitz, Brian Roberts, David Lawee, Hiroshi Mikitani, John Zimmer, Jonathan Christodoro, Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., Mary Agnes (Maggie) Wilderotter, Prashant (Sean) Aggarwal, Valerie Jarrett. (Smith, Colleen) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lyft, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Rakuten, Inc. for Lyft, Inc.. (Smith, Colleen) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13536643.) filed by Deep Dinesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shepardson, Stephen) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Burke Kennamer (Kennamer, Frank) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M Papay (Papay, Kevin) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 18, 2019 Set Hearings, See Docket Nos. 29 in 4:19-cv-02690-HSG and 26 in 4:19-cv-03003- HSG: Telephone Conference set for 7/23/2019 03:00 PM in Oakland, Chambers before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 35 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Academy Securities, Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Canaccord Genuity LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Drexel Hamilton, LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Great Pacific Securities, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, KKR Capital Markets, LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Penserra Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., R. Seelaus & Co., LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc., Siebert Cisneros Shank & Co., L.L.C., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Tigress Financial Partners LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Canaccord Adams Delaware Inc., Other Affiliate Canaccord Genuity Inc., Other Affiliate Collins Stewart Inc., Other Affiliate Canaccord Adams Financial Group Inc. for Canaccord Genuity LLC; Corporate Parent Tigress Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Cynthia Dibartolo for Tigress Financial Partners LLC; Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC; Corporate Parent J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC; Other Affiliate Kalispell Tribal Economic Authority, Other Affiliate Blaylock & Co., Inc., Other Affiliate Robert Van Securities Inc. for Blaylock Van, LLC; Corporate Parent Evercore Inc., Other Affiliate Evercore Inc., Other Affiliate Evercore Group Holdings L.P., Other Affiliate Evercore Partners Services East L.L.C., Other Affiliate Evercore BD Investco L.L.C. for Evercore Group L.L.C.; Corporate Parent JMP Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate JMP Group Inc., Other Affiliate JMP Investment Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate JMP Group LLC, Other Affiliate Joseph A. Jolson for JMP Securities LLC; Corporate Parent Cowen Inc. for Cowen and Company, LLC; Corporate Parent R. Seelaus & Co., Inc. for R. Seelaus & Co., LLC; Other Affiliate Candace King Weir, Other Affiliate Amelia Farley Weir, Other Affiliate Katherine Broussard Weir for C.L. King & Associates, Inc.; Other Affiliate David T. Swoish, Other Affiliate Christopher Vinck-Luna for Great Pacific Securities; Corporate Parent Keycorp for KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc.; Corporate Parent Jefferies Group LLC, Other Affiliate Jefferies Financial Group Inc. for Jefferies LLC; Corporate Parent Everen Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo & Company, Other Affiliate WFC Holdings, LLC for Wells Fargo Securities, LLC; Corporate Parent KKR & Co. Inc. for KKR Capital Markets, LLC; Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc., Corporate Parent UBS Americas Holding LLC, Other Affiliate UBS AG, Other Affiliate UBS Group AG for UBS Securities LLC; Corporate Parent Raymond James Financial, Inc. for Raymond James & Associates, Inc.; Corporate Parent Piper Jaffray Companies for Piper Jaffray & Co.; Corporate Parent Stifel Financial Corp. for Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated; Corporate Parent Penserra Financial Ventures LLC for Penserra Securities LLC; Other Affiliate GTS Holding Company, Other Affiliate Dean A. Chamberlain, Other Affiliate Doyle L. Holmes for Mischler Financial Group, Inc.; Corporate Parent Siebert Cisneros Shank & Co., L.L.C., Corporate Parent Siebert Cisneros Shank Financial, LLC for Siebert Cisneros Shank & Co., L.L.C.; Corporate Parent SAR Holdings, Inc. for Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc.; Corporate Parent The Williams Capital Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Christopher J. Williams for The Williams Capital Group, L.P.; Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA) Inc., Other Affiliate Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc. for Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. and Certification of Interested Entities (L.R. 3-15) (Shimada, Charlene) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene Sachi Shimada , Frank B. Kennamer, and Kevin M. Papay (Shimada, Charlene) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 33 Statement of Non-Opposition re #28 JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Consolidation of Cases filed byPrashant (Sean) Aggarwal, Jonathan Christodoro, Logan Green, Ben Horowitz, Valerie Jarrett, David Lawee, Lyft, Inc., Hiroshi Mikitani, Ann Miura-Ko, Brian Roberts, Mary Agnes (Maggie) Wilderotter, John Zimmer. (Related document(s) #28 ) (Smith, Colleen) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Carlton Smith on behalf of Lyft, Inc., Logan Green, John Zimmer, Brian Roberts, Prashant (Sean) Aggarwal, Jonathan Christodoro, Ben Horowitz, Valerie Jarrett, David Lawee, Hiroshi Mikitani, Ann Miura-Ko, and Mary Agnes (Maggie) Wilderotter (Smith, Colleen) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Rawlinson on behalf of Lyft, Inc., Logan Green, John Zimmer, Brian Roberts, Prashant (Sean) Aggarwal, Jonathan Christodoro, Ben Horowitz, Valerie Jarrett, David Lawee, Hiroshi Mikitani, Ann Miura-Ko, and Mary Agnes (Maggie) Wilderotter (Rawlinson, Matthew) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth L. Deeley on behalf of Lyft, Inc., Logan Green, John Zimmer, Brian Roberts, Prashant (Sean) Aggarwal, Jonathan Christodoro, Ben Horowitz, Valerie Jarrett, David Lawee, Hiroshi Mikitani, Ann Miura-Ko, and Mary Agnes (Maggie) Wilderotter (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. SETTING a telephone conference at 3:00 p.m. on July 23, 2019. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the proposed consolidation of cases. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephone appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Document also listed case number 4:19-cv-3003-HSG. If it is intended to be applied to the other case number, please e-file in that case also. If the document is not applicable to that case, please re-file the document in its entirety with the correct caption. Re: #28 JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Consolidation of Cases filed by Matias Malig, as Trustee for the Malig Family Trust (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 17, 2019 Reset Hearings as to Docket Nos. #16 , #9 and #12 , See Docket Nos. #25 - #27 : Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 28 **RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #46 ** JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Consolidation of Cases filed by Matias Malig, as Trustee for the Malig Family Trust. Responses due by 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 7/17/2019) Modified on 7/18/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/25/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2019 Filing 27 Renotice motion hearing re #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byDeep Dinesh Patel. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Rick Keiner Corrected Notice of Motion re #9 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 7/17/2019) Modified on 7/18/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion of the Lyft Investor Group for Consolidation of the Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead Counsel by Rakesh Khanna, Danilo Nunez, Harold Tholen re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #13 Declaration in Support, (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 7/17/2019) Modified on 7/18/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2019 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Document also listed case number 4:19-cv-3003-HSG. If it is intended to be applied to the other case number, please e-file in that case also. If the document is not applicable to that case, please re-file the Motion in its entirety with the correct caption. ALSO In the future, please attach all supporting documents to the Motion and that case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:19-cv-2690-HSG. Re: #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Terry S. Bradford, #9 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Rick Keiner, #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Deep Dinesh Patel, #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Danilo Nunez, Harold Tholen, Rakesh Khanna (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE Re Docket Nos. #9 , #12 and #16 . Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re-file the motions. Hearing date of August 22nd, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel are directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motions for a new hearing date. August 22nd was not the Court's next available hearing date when these motion were e-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Terry S. Bradford re #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Jennifer Pafiti on behalf of Terry S. Bradford (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 Declaration of Jennifer Pafiti in Support of #20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byTerry S. Bradford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Loss Chart, #2 Exhibit B - Press Release, #3 Exhibit C - Certification, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #20 ) (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Terry S. Bradford. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 7/30/2019. Replies due by 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deep Dinesh Patel (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Laurence Matthew Rosen on behalf of Deep Dinesh Patel (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 7/16/2019) Modified on 7/17/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 Declaration of Laurence Rosen in Support of #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byDeep Dinesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Deep Dinesh Patel. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 7/30/2019. Replies due by 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rakesh Khanna, Danilo Nunez, Harold Tholen (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Counsel PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Adam Christopher McCall on behalf of Rakesh Khanna, Danilo Nunez, Harold Tholen (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Adam C. McCall in Support of #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byRakesh Khanna, Danilo Nunez, Harold Tholen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #12 ) (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Harold Tholen, Danilo Nunez, Rakesh Khanna. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 7/30/2019. Replies due by 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCall, Adam) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to LR 3-7(d) by Jacob Allen Walker on behalf of Rick Keiner (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rick Keiner (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Rick Keiner. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 7/30/2019. Replies due by 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jacob A. Walker)(Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 7/16/2019) Modified on 7/17/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Hon. Haywood. S. Gilliam, Jr., VACATING the initial case management conference scheduled for August 20, 2019 and DIRECTING all parties in the related cases (4:19-cv-2690-HSG and 4:19-cv-3003-HSG) to meet and confer and submit a joint administrative motion to consolidate the cases by July 17, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RELATING CASE to 19-cv-3003-YGR. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/9/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUA SPONTE ORDER OF REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED re 19-cv-3003-YGR and 19-cv-2690-HSG. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/26/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Matias Malig, as Trustee for the Malig Family Trust of Publication of PSLRA Notice Pursuant to Local Rule 23-1(a) (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 5/20/2019) Modified on 5/21/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION SEC Class Action Notice due by 6/7/2019. Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Matias Malig, as Trustee for the Malig Family Trust (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 5/17/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Academy Securities, Inc., Prashant Aggarwal, Blaylock Van, LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Canaccord Genuity LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Jonathan Christodoro, Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Drexel Hamilton, LLC, Evercore Group L.L.C., Great Pacific Securities, Logan Green, Ben Horowitz, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Valerie Jarrett, Jefferies LLC, KKR Capital Markets, LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., David Lawee, Loop Capital Markets, LLC, Lyft, Inc., Hiroshi Mikitani, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Ann Miura-Ko, Penserra Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., R. Seelaus & Co., LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Brian Roberts, Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc., Siebert Cisneros Shank & Co., L.L.C., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Tigress Financial Partners LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Mary Agnes Wilderotter, John Zimmer ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13359025.). Filed byMatias Malig, as Trustee for the Malig Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Certification of Securities)(Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 5/17/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Lyft Inc. Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Roberts
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Williams Capital Group, L.P.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castleoak Securities, L.P.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMP Securities LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lawee
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Jarrett
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penserra Securities LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Green
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Agnes Wilderotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siebert Cisneros Shank & Co., L.L.C.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Pacific Securities
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loop Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Zimmer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evercore Group L.L.C.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drexel Hamilton, LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Seelaus & Co., LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiroshi Mikitani
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canaccord Genuity LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaylock Van, LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prashant Aggarwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.L. King & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mischler Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Horowitz
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Miura-Ko
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen and Company, LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tigress Financial Partners LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KKR Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Charlene Sachi Shimada
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Represented By: Kevin M Papay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Christodoro
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Agnes (Maggie) Wilderotter
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prashant (Sean) Aggarwal
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Colleen Carlton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matias Malig, as Trustee for the Malig Family Trust
Represented By: Jacob Allen Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harold Tholen
Represented By: Adam Christopher McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Deep Dinesh Patel
Represented By: Stephen Michael Shepardson
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rakesh Khanna
Represented By: Adam Christopher McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terry S. Bradford
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rick Keiner
Represented By: Jacob Allen Walker
Represented By: Whitney E. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danilo Nunez
Represented By: Adam Christopher McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?