Tang v. City and County of San Francisco

Plaintiff: Kezia Tang
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 4:2019cv02792
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Spencer Stoughton (Stoughton, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kezia Tang.. (Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City and County of San Francisco.. (Rolnick, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of San Francisco re 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Rolnick, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/ 14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Answer to Removal Complaint by City and County of San Francisco. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/11/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Receipt - Filing Fee Paid; 34611142625. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA re #1 Notice of Removal, by City and County of San Francisco. (Rolnick, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California- County of San Francisco. (No process). Their case number is CGC-19-575346. (). Filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rolnick, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/31/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tang v. City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kezia Tang
Represented By: Ayse Kuzucuoglu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Jonathan C. Rolnick
Represented By: Jennifer Spencer Stoughton
Represented By: Katharine Hobin Porter
Represented By: Dennis J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?