Lawrence v. Apple Inc.

Plaintiff: Edward Lawrence
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02852
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Cynthia E. Richman. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Phan (Phan, Melissa) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13465502.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Richman, Cynthia) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint filed by Apple Inc. and Edward Lawrence. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 6/20/2019) Modified on 6/21/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 Statement Defendant Apple Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc.. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Joseph Doren Notice of Appearance of Daniel G. Swanson. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Joseph Doren (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Joseph Doren Notice of Appearance of Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Judge William Alsup no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER. The Court finds that Cases 11-cv-06714 YGR and 19-cv-02852 WHA are related. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/12/19. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/28/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 24, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF))
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2019 10:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Papale, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Edward Lawrence.. (Papale, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Edward Lawrence . (Papale, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13375379.). Filed byEdward Lawrence. (Papale, Lawrence) (Filed on 5/23/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Richard Joseph Doren
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Phan
Represented By: Cynthia Richman
Represented By: Daniel Glen Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Lawrence
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Jeffery Kenneth Perkins
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?