Kuklok v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Brendan Kuklok
Defendant: United States of America and Department of Veteran Affairs
Case Number: 4:2019cv02958
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brendan Kuklok re #5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brendan Kuklok. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brendan Kuklok. Department of Veteran Affairs served on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; United States of America served on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Department of Veteran Affairs, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Department of Veteran Affairs, United States of America (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt No. 44611016301). Filed by Brendan Kuklok. Consent/Declination due by 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019) Modified on 5/30/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuklok v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan Kuklok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?