Akhile v. Equinox Holdings Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Anja Akhile
Defendant: Equinox Holdings Inc. and Equinox Fitness Berkeley, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03331
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Equinox Fitness Berkeley, Inc., Equinox Holdings Inc. Why Action Should Not Be Remanded for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Weinhaus in Support of Response to Order to Show Cause Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction)(Brown, Tyler) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge SAUNDRA BROWN ARMSTRONG on 7/12/19. Show Cause Response due by 7/26/2019. Responses due by 8/2/2019. Replies due by 8/9/2019. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2019. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2019 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/13/19. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Equinox Fitness Berkeley, Inc., Equinox Holdings Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Equinox Holdings Inc. for Equinox Holdings Inc.. (Brown, Tyler) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Answer filed on June 11, 2019 in Superior Court of California, County of Alameda by Equinox Holdings, Inc. and Equinox Fitness Corporation. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 9/ 11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2019 02:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. The corr ect event can be found at: Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:[1-4] Supplement Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Defendant Equinox Holdings Inc. filed by Equinox Fitness Berkeley, Inc., Equinox Holdings Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Equinox Fitness Berkeley, Inc., Equinox Holdings Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Brown, Tyler) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTIONS 1332, 1367 and 1441(b) with jury demand from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG19018520. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13430650). Filed by Equinox Holdings Inc., Equinox Fitness Berkeley, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Neta Levanon in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal of Action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, #3 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Notice of Removal, #4 Supplement Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Defendant Equinox Holdings, Inc.)(Brown, Tyler) (Filed on 6/12/2019) Modified on 6/13/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akhile v. Equinox Holdings Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equinox Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Tyler A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equinox Fitness Berkeley, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anja Akhile
Represented By: David J Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?