Javitch v. Taylor

Plaintiff: Mark L. Javitch
Defendant: Alando Grossett Taylor
Case Number: 4:2019cv03417
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Mark L. Javitch (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 8/9/2019) Modified on 8/12/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Going forward, the parties are encouraged to file a stipulation in lieu of an unopposed motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Mark L. Javitch. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark L. Javitch.. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/22/2019. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark L. Javitch. Alando Grossett Taylor served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alando Grossett Taylor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13440024.). Filed by Mark L. Javitch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 6/14/2019) Modified on 6/17/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Javitch v. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alando Grossett Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark L. Javitch
Represented By: Mark Louis Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?