Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC v. American Custom Marble, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC
Defendant: American Custom Marble, Inc., Patricia A. Sharpe and Patricia A. Sharp
Case Number: 4:2019cv03424
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration of Theophilus Austin Mills, III in Support of #16 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Dismiss filed byEden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 Request for Judicial Notice re #16 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byEden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byEden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Hans W. Herb, #2 Declaration Aiden J. Sanchez, #3 Declaration Xhavin Sinha)(Herb, Hans) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Patricia A. Sharp.. (Tropea, Santino) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 Motion to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2019 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/18/2019 01:30 PM and the hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #9 previously set for 9/19/2019 01:00 PM have been rescheduled to 9/17/2019 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu, at the U.S. District Court, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California 94612. For courtroom number and floor information, please check the court's on-line calendar at http://www.cand.uscourts.gov) on Friday, prior to the scheduled hearing date. The Joint Case Management Statement is due no later than 9/10/2019. The briefing schedule re: Motion to Dismiss remains in effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019).
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Custom Marble, Inc., Patricia A. Sharp.. (Tropea, Santino) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case number and Judge name or initials are incorrect, incomplete and/or missing regarding #10 Request for Judicial Notice #9 MOTION to Dismiss and #11 Certificate of Interested Entities, all filed by American Custom Marble, Inc., Patricia A. Sharp. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct case number and judge name/initials on all future filings: 4:19-cv-03424-DMR. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Custom Marble, Inc., Patricia A. Sharp (Tropea, Santino) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Judicial Notice re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed byAmerican Custom Marble, Inc., Patricia A. Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Tropea, Santino) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Custom Marble, Inc., Patricia A. Sharp. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2019 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 8/9/2019. Replies due by 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Santino M. Tropea, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tropea, #3 Proposed Order)(Tropea, Santino) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. American Custom Marble, Inc. served on 7/13/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. Patricia A. Sharp served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to American Custom Marble, Inc., Patricia A. Sharp. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC.. (Sinha, Xhavin) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 15, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sinha, Xhavin) (Filed on 6/15/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Civil Penalties against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13440840.). Filed byEden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Notice Ltr, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sinha, Xhavin) (Filed on 6/14/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC v. American Custom Marble, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC
Represented By: Xhavin Sinha
Represented By: Craig Alfred Brandt
Represented By: Hans William Herb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Custom Marble, Inc.
Represented By: Santino Michael Tropea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Sharp
Represented By: Santino Michael Tropea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?