Redka v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Redka
Defendant: AT&T Eligible Former Employee Advantage Medical Program No. 980, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company and AT&T Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03442
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Further Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to #1 the Complaint filed by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, AT&T Eligible Former Employee Advantage Medical Program No. 980, AT&T Services, Inc., Joseph Redka. (Joo, Sylvia) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend All Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, AT&T Eligible Former Employee Advantage Medical Program No. 980, AT&T Services, Inc., Joseph Redka. (Joo, Sylvia) (Filed on 7/18/2019) Modified on 7/19/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Laurie Elizabeth Sherwood on behalf of Defendant AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1 (named as AT&T Services, Inc. and AT&T Eligible Former Employee Advantage Medical Program No. 980 in the Complaint) (Sherwood, Laurie) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Daniel M. Combs. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Daniel M. Combs (Filing fee $310, receipt number 26IMK9C3; 0971-13500.) Filing fee previously paid on 07/08/2019 filed by AT&T Eligible Former Employee Advantage Medical Program No. 980, AT&T Services, Inc. (Combs, Daniel) (Filed on 7/8/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by AT&T Eligible Former Employee Advantage Medical Program No. 980, AT&T Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T, Other Affiliate AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1, Other Affiliate AT&T Services, Inc. for AT&T Eligible Former Employee Advantage Medical Program No. 980, AT&T Services, Inc.. on behalf of Defendant AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1 (named as AT&T Services, Inc. and AT&T Eligible Former Employee Advantage Medical Program No. 980 in the Complaint) (Sherwood, Laurie) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to File Answer or First Responsive Pleading filed by AT&T Eligible Former Employee Advantage Medical Program No. 980, AT&T Services, Inc., Joseph Redka. (Sherwood, Laurie) (Filed on 7/8/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie Elizabeth Sherwood on behalf of Defendant AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1 (named as AT&T Services, Inc. and AT&T Eligible Former Employee Advantage Medical Program No. 980 in the Complaint) (Sherwood, Laurie) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/19/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 06/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AT&T Eligible Former Employee Advantage Medical Program No. 980, AT&T Services, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joseph Redka.. (Kim, Brian) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons-AT&T Services, Inc., #2 Summons Summons-AT&T Eligible Former Employee Advantage Medical Program No. 980)(Kim, Brian) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13443777.). Filed byJoseph Redka. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kim, Brian) (Filed on 6/17/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redka v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Redka
Represented By: Brian Henry Kim
Represented By: James Pieper Keenley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Eligible Former Employee Advantage Medical Program No. 980
Represented By: Laurie Elizabeth Sherwood
Represented By: Daniel Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Sylvia Joo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: Laurie Elizabeth Sherwood
Represented By: Daniel Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?