Watanabe et al v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Watanabe and Kristina Watanabe
Defendant: John Kanouse and USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03551
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION To Toll the Statute of Limitations and Dismiss Pending Action Without Prejudice filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Kristina Watanabe, and Ryan Watanabe. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/2/2019) Modified on 8/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Janet Choi (Choi, Janet) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Foley, Mark. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 18, 2019 Set Hearing as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss, See Docket No. #16 : Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 Renotice motion hearing re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed byUSAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:19-cv-03551-HSG. Re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file the #14 motion to dismiss. Hearing date of August 29, 2019, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. August 29th was not the Court's next available hearing date when this motion was e-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 7/31/2019. Replies due by 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13528053.) filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Foley, Mark) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for September 24, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by September 17, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-03760-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 7/3/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Frost as counsel for USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/3/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company re #2 Jury Trial Demand, re #1 Notice of Removal (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO DISTRICT COURT UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1441(B) [DIVERSITY JURISDICTION] from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-57035, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13451463). Filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/20/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watanabe et al v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Watanabe
Represented By: James Gaughan O'Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Watanabe
Represented By: James Gaughan O'Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kanouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas Justin Boos
Represented By: Mark David Foley, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Charles Frost
Represented By: Janet Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?