City of Walnut Creek v. Admiral Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: City of Walnut Creek
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Admiral Insurance Company, Transcontinental Insurance Company, Atlanta International Insurance Company, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Phoenix Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company and Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 4:2019cv03556
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (Docket Nos. 24 in case 4:19-cv-02237-HSG and 29 in case 4:19-cv-03556-HSG) Stipulation Consolidating Cases for All Purposes. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Cases for All Purposes filed by City of Walnut Creek, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Admiral Insurance Company, Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, and Atlanta International Insurance Company. (Botha, Wentzelee) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #21 Counterclaim of Admiral Insurance Company by City of Walnut Creek. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Botha, Wentzelee) (Filed on 7/31/2019) Modified on 8/1/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY (re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Second and Third Causes of Action; Motion for a More Definite Statement in The Alternative ) filed byInsurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Valentine, Dawn) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Second and Third Causes of Action; Motion for a More Definite Statement in The Alternative ) filed byCity of Walnut Creek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Botha, Wentzelee) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 11, 2019 Reset Hearing as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Second and Third Causes of Action; Motion for a More Definite Statement in The Alternative, See Docket No. #25 : Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 25 Ren-notice of Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Second and Third Causes of Action; Motion for a More Definite Statement in The Alternative by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania (Valentine, Dawn) (Filed on 7/11/2019) Modified on 7/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2019 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. (AIG), Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty U.S. Inc. for Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Valentine, Dawn) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for October 1, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by September 24, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-03556-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/11/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 21 COUNTERCLAIM against City of Walnut Creek. Filed byAdmiral Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Derfler, James) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Admiral Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Derfler, James) (Filed on 7/10/2019) Modified on 7/11/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byAdmiral Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Derfler, James) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Second and Third Causes of Action; Motion for a More Definite Statement in The Alternative filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/24/2019. Replies due by 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Valentine, Dawn) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 Case reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Atlanta International Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. is a publicly-held corporation that owns 100% of Columbia Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Drake Insurance Company of New York, Other Affiliate Columbia Insurance Company for Atlanta International Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Thorpe, Sara) (Filed on 7/8/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2019.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for Judge Maxine M. Chesney, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RELATED CASE ORDER. C 19-2237 MMC and C 19-3556 JSC are related. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 3, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company.. (Celebrezze, Bruce) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. (Celebrezze, Bruce) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Atlanta International Insurance Company, and Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/16/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of Walnut Creek.. (Botha, Wentzelee) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT [N.D. CAL. L.R. 6-1(a)] filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Valentine, Dawn) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byAtlanta International Insurance Company. (Seibert, Ethan) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 19, 2019 Answer to Removed Complaint (see document #1 -2) filed by Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Compnay re #2 Declaration in Support, #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities (Chorley, Jason) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/24/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/24/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Compnay identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, The Phoenix Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Chorley, Jason) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/24/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/3/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of Jason J. Chorley in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Compnay. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Chorley, Jason) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/24/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa. Their case number is C19-00883. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13452029). Filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Compnay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chorley, Jason) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/24/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Walnut Creek v. Admiral Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admiral Insurance Company
Represented By: James Thomas Derfler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcontinental Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta International Insurance Company
Represented By: Sara M. Thorpe
Represented By: Ethan Hansa Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason J Chorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jason J Chorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason J Chorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Represented By: Bruce D. Celebrezze
Represented By: Jason J Chorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Matthew A. Richards
Represented By: Dawn Noel Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Walnut Creek
Represented By: Wentzelee Botha
Represented By: Ryan Drobek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?