Illektron LLC v. Electronic Arts Inc.
Plaintiff: Illektron LLC
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03648
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Electronic Arts Inc.. Filed byIllektron LLC. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Illektron LLC and Electronic Arts, Inc. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/14/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Illektron LLC, Electronic Arts Inc. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 7/9/2019) Modified on 7/10/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Illektron LLC identifying Other Affiliate Gregory Sherman, Other Affiliate James Stuart, Other Affiliate Chad Smith, Other Affiliate Steve Aldaco, Other Affiliate Brandi Aldaco, Other Affiliate Alex Aguilar, Other Affiliate Rene Aguilar, Other Affiliate Valentina Faltoni, Other Affiliate Richard Friedman, Other Affiliate Greg Frech, Other Affiliate Marisa Frech, Other Affiliate Eric Hershberger, Other Affiliate Courtney Hershberger, Other Affiliate Zontan Posa, Other Affiliate Tasha Posa, Other Affiliate David Regalia, Other Affiliate Steven Sanford, Other Affiliate Dawn Sanford, Other Affiliate Trudy Sherman, Other Affiliate Margit Sherman, Other Affiliate Todd Sherman, Other Affiliate Jerald Stuart, Other Affiliate David Trudgen, Other Affiliate Troy Zimmerman, Other Affiliate Mindy Zimmerman for Illektron LLC. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Electronic Arts Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Illektron LLC . (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Electronic Arts Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13461885.). Filed by Illektron LLC. (Clapp, Fritz) (Filed on 6/24/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illektron LLC v. Electronic Arts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illektron LLC
Represented By: Fritz Clapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?