Bombita v. Maersk Line, Ltd.
Plaintiff: ALLAN D BOMBITA
Defendant: Maersk Line, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03707
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
2 Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for all Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/22/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY (re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 Renotice motion hearing Defendant, Maersk Line, Limited's, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue ) filed byAllan D Bombita. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas M. Discon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Discon, Thomas) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 Renotice motion hearing Defendant, Maersk Line, Limited's, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue ) filed byMaersk Line, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kuhne, James) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #25 Stipulation EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSE AND REPLY MEMORANDA. Responses due by 9/3/2019. Replies due by 9/10/2019.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re #22 Renotice motion hearing filed by Allan D Bombita, Maersk Line, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Discon, Thomas) (Filed on 8/20/2019) Modified on 8/21/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Expedite #24 Complainant's Opposed Motion to Enlarge Deadline to File Opposition to Defendant, Maersk Line, Limited's, Motion to Dismiss filed by Allan D Bombita. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Discon, Thomas) (Filed on 8/19/2019) Modified on 8/20/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 Renotice motion hearing Defendant, Maersk Line, Limited's, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by ALLAN D BOMBITA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Discon, Thomas) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 22 Renotice Motion Hearing Re: #18 Motion to Dismiss filed by Maersk Line, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Steven Hadder, #2 Proposed Order)(Kuhne, James) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Re-notice motion. The correct event can be found at: Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings >g t; Other Supporting Documents > Re-notice motion. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (re-noticed motion) filed by Maersk Line, Ltd. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (re-noticed motion) filed by Maersk Line, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 8/16/2019. Replies due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kuhne, James) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 1, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Counsel is Instructed to Re-Notice this Motion to a Available Court Date. Please Check the Scheduling Notes for Judge White, which are Available on the C ourt's Website. [err201] Re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Maersk Line, Ltd. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Maersk Line, Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Charles Taylor P&I Management (Amercas), Inc. (The Standard Club's P&I Manager), Other Affiliate The Standard Club Ltd. (Defendant's Protection & Indemnity club) for Maersk Line, Ltd.. re Electronic Filing Error,, #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Kuhne, James) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons must be filed separately. Event can be found at: Civil Events Other Filings Notices Certificate of Int erested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. Be sure to add all interested parties when prompted. Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 Declaration of Steven E. Hadder in Support of #18 Maersk Line, Limited's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdication filed byMaersk Line, Ltd. (Kuhne, James) (Filed on 7/31/2019) Modified on 7/31/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Maersk Line, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 8/14/2019. Replies due by 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Interested Entities or Person, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kuhne, James) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALLAN D BOMBITA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Discon, Thomas) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALLAN D BOMBITA re #12 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Discon, Thomas) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLAN D BOMBITA. Maersk Line, Ltd. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Discon, Thomas) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Thomas M. Discon. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Robert K. Lansden. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/8/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/8/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Robert K. Lansden (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13497174) filed by ALLAN D BOMBITA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lansden, Robert) (Filed on 7/8/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Thomas M. Discon (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13497111) filed by ALLAN D BOMBITA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Discon, Thomas) (Filed on 7/8/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 4, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ALLAN D BOMBITA.. (Moore, Frank) (Filed on 7/4/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Maersk Line, Ltd.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Moore, Frank) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/10/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by ALLAN D BOMBITA . (Moore, Frank) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maersk Line, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13469881.). Filed byALLAN D BOMBITA. (Moore, Frank) (Filed on 6/26/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bombita v. Maersk Line, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLAN D BOMBITA
Represented By: Frank Scott Moore
Represented By: Thomas Discon
Represented By: Robert Kent Lansden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maersk Line, Ltd.
Represented By: James F Kuhne, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?