Downey v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Defendant: United States of America et al and Apple Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv03717
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2019 and Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/29/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RECUSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge. However, incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used at case opening of JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 02/19). Clerk to mail plaintiff co rrect Civil Cover Sheet to be completed and return to court for filing as separate docket entry. re #1 .1]. Complaint filed by Mark Downey (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Judge Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark Downey. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America et al. Filed by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downey v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?