Sermons v. Apple Inc
Plaintiff: Barry Sermons
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv03796
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 37 Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Judge William Alsup no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO RELATE CASES; RELATING CASES 4:11-cv-6714-YGR and 19-cv-3074-WHA and 19-cv-3796-WHA. Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference in all cases is specially set for Friday, 9/13/2019 09:00 AM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/22/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant Apple Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by Apple Inc. and Barry Sermons (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Cynthia E. Richman. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13546385.) filed by Apple Inc. (Richman, Cynthia) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Phan (Phan, Melissa) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Glen Swanson (Swanson, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Joseph Doren (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Kimberly A. Justice. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jonathan M. Jagher. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Brian M. Hogan. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Douglas A. Millen. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 23 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kimberly A. Justice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13540364.) Filing fee previously paid on 07/22/19 filed by Barry Sermons. (Justice, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 22 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan M. Jagher ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13540284.) Filing fee previously paid on 07/22/19 filed by Barry Sermons. (Jagher, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brian M. Hogan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13540264.) Filing fee previously paid on 07/22/19 filed by Barry Sermons. (Hogan, Brian) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Douglas A. Millen ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13540231.) Filing fee previously paid on 07/22/19 filed by Barry Sermons. (Millen, Douglas) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Kimberly A. Justice. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jonathan M. Jagher. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Brian M. Hogan. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Douglas A. Millen. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kimberly A. Justice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13540364.) filed by Barry Sermons. (Justice, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan M. Jagher ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13540284.) filed by Barry Sermons. (Jagher, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brian M. Hogan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13540264.) filed by Barry Sermons. (Hogan, Brian) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Douglas A. Millen ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13540231.) filed by Barry Sermons. (Millen, Douglas) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 07/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Barry Sermons.. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barry Sermons. Apple Inc served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 ***DISREGARD ENTRY, WRONG DATE ON SUMMONS. SEE DOCKET ENTRY #6 .*** Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) Modified on 7/1/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/12/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Apple Inc (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-13479570). Filed by Barry Sermons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 6/28/2019) Modified on 7/1/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sermons v. Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Richard Joseph Doren
Represented By: Daniel Glen Swanson
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Phan
Represented By: Cynthia Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Sermons
Represented By: Richard Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Guido Saveri
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Jagher
Represented By: Brian Michael Hogan
Represented By: Douglas A. Millen
Represented By: Kimberly A Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?