Doe v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Richard Valeika
Case Number: 4:2019cv03852
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #26 Administrative Motion to amend the Scheduling Order: Defendants' Answer and Certified copy of the transcript of the Administrative Record due by 10/17/2019; Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/2/2019; Defendants' opposition and/or counter-motion due by 1/23/2020; Plaintiff's reply due by 2/24/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 26 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to amend scheduling order filed by John Doe and All Defendants. Responses due by 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hemmer, Alex) (Filed on 8/27/2019) Modified on 8/28/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2019 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Richard Valeika.. (Moran, Courtney) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Elizabeth Moran on behalf of Defendants (Moran, Courtney) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. (Hemmer, Alex) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. (Hemmer, Alex) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. (Hemmer, Alex) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. (Hemmer, Alex) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. (Hemmer, Alex) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 30, 2019 #Electronic filing error. No title Page regarding #18 Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed by John Doe, #17 Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed by John Doe, #14 Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed by John Doe, #16 Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed by John Doe, #15 Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed by John Doe. Proof of Services e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 regarding first page requirement. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in it's entirety. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Hemmer, Alex) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Richard Valeika served on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Hemmer, Alex) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Hemmer, Alex) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Hemmer, Alex) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Kevin K. McAleenan served on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Hemmer, Alex) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Richard Valeika. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. (Hemmer, Alex) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting as modified #5 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Leave to Proceed Pseudonymously. Signed on 7/12/2019.(dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Doe.. (Hemmer, Alex) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #4 Mark C. Fleming's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #3 Alex C. Hemmer's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/17/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for leave to proceed pseudonymously filed by John Doe. Responses due by 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Doe, #2 Declaration of Marie Vincent, #3 Proposed Order)(Vincent, Marie) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13490659.) Filing fee previously paid on 07/03/2019 filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Fleming, Mark) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13490601.) filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hemmer, Alex) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Vincent, Marie) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (no process) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13490296.). Filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vincent, Marie) (Filed on 7/3/2019) Modified on 7/5/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Valeika
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Alex C. Hemmer
Represented By: Mark C Fleming
Represented By: Marie Anne Julie Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?