Williams v. Highland Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Robert Lawrence Williams
Defendant: Discharge Nurses/Drs., Finley Delvecchio, Highland Hospital and Genetal Surgeon
Case Number: 4:2019cv03940
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR DISMISSAL re #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Lawrence Williams. Objections due by 9/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/30/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/14/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCREENING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Amended Complaint due by 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Lawrence Williams. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2019: #1 Envelope) (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Under the Civil Rights Act Against Finley Delvecchio, Discharge Nurses/Drs., Genetal Surgeon, Highland Hospital. Filed by Robert Lawrence Williams. Consent/Declination due by 7/23/2019. (No Process) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Highland Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discharge Nurses/Drs.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finley Delvecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genetal Surgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lawrence Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?