Jegers v. Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Peter Jegers
Defendant: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03982
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Peter Jegers. (McAuley, Gordon) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 25, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case number or initials are incorrect/incomplete regarding #9 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Atain Specialty In surance Company. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct case number on all future filings: 4:19-cv-03982-DMR (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Atain Specialty Insurance Company re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, and initial case opening documents (Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Atain Specialty Insurance Company.. (Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Peter Jegers (Gumbiner, Joel) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peter Jegers.. (Gumbiner, Joel) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/25/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Atain Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AJK Holdings, LLC for Atain Specialty Insurance Company. re #1 Notice of Removal (Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Atain Specialty Insurance Company . (Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is CIVMSC19-00291. (No Process)(Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13509763). Filed byAtain Specialty Insurance Company. (Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 7/11/2019) Modified on 7/11/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jegers v. Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: GailAnn Y. Stargardter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Jegers
Represented By: Gordon Douglas McAuley
Represented By: Joel Philip Gumbiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?