Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC v. Western Colloid Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC
Defendant: Western Colloid Products, Inc., Western Colloid N.C., Inc., Justin McDaniels, Gary Scholten and Dale Scholten
Case Number: 4:2019cv03995
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Justin McDaniels, Dale Scholten, Gary Scholten, Western Colloid N.C., Inc., Western Colloid Products, Inc. (Diveley, Shaye) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Western Colloid Products, Inc.. Service waived by Western Colloid Products, Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Diveley, Shaye) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Western Colloid N.C., Inc.. Service waived by Western Colloid N.C., Inc. waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Diveley, Shaye) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Scholten. Service waived by Gary Scholten waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Diveley, Shaye) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Dale Scholten. Service waived by Dale Scholten waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Diveley, Shaye) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Justin McDaniels. Service waived by Justin McDaniels waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Diveley, Shaye) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaye Diveley (Diveley, Shaye) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Justin McDaniels, Dale Scholten, Gary Scholten, Western Colloid N.C., Inc., Western Colloid Products, Inc.. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC.. (Sinha, Xhavin) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Sinha, Xhavin) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/25/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive And Declaratory Relief, Civil Penalties And Remediation against All Defendants (No Process) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13511177.). Filed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brandt, Craig) (Filed on 7/11/2019) Modified on 7/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC v. Western Colloid Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC
Represented By: Craig Alfred Brandt
Represented By: Xhavin Sinha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Colloid Products, Inc.
Represented By: Shaye Diveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Colloid N.C., Inc.
Represented By: Shaye Diveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin McDaniels
Represented By: Shaye Diveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Scholten
Represented By: Shaye Diveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Scholten
Represented By: Shaye Diveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?