Grago v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Daniel Stuart Grago
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04043
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Daniel Stuart Grago. (Korper, Rene) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/24/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 07/24/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Danziger, Jacob) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc., Other Affiliate Ford International Capital, Other Affiliate Ford Motor Company Limited for Ford Motor Company. (Danziger, Jacob) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document ( #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ford Motor Com pany). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents .Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #3 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Ford Motor Company (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2019 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 #1 Answer to Complaint. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Pendency of Other Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL Order, #2 Exhibit B - MDL Case List)(Danziger, Jacob) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ford Motor Company. (Danziger, Jacob) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 **DISREGARD, RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. #8 ** Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company (Danziger, Jacob) (Filed on 7/15/2019) Modified on 7/17/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Ford Motor Company . (Danziger, Jacob) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Marin County. Their case number is CIV1902397. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13519348). Filed byFord Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B- Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Answer, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to Adverse Party of Removal, #5 Exhibit E - Notice to Court Clerk of Removal, #6 Exhibit F- Danziger Declaration ISO Removal)(Danziger, Jacob) (Filed on 7/15/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grago v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jacob Klein Danziger
Represented By: Derin Kiykioglu
Represented By: Steven Edward Swaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Stuart Grago
Represented By: Rene Korper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?