Hartford Fire Insurance Company v. Carrier Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Carrier Corporation and ABB Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04049
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant Carrier Corporation's ANSWER to Crossclaim (with jury demand) Filed by ABB Inc. by Carrier Corporation. (Ingram, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/30/2019) Modified on 9/3/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 ABB's Answer to #6 Cross-Claim of Carrier Corporation, CROSSCLAIM against Carrier Corporation (with jury demand) by ABB Inc. (Sipprelle, Keith) (Filed on 8/12/2019) Modified on 8/13/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/8/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 07/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carrier Corporation.. (Ingram, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Jeans-Berezowsky, Lubomyr) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hartford Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Jeans-Berezowsky, Lubomyr) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by ABB Inc. re #7 Certificate of Interested Entities (Sipprelle, Keith) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by ABB Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Abb Ltd., Corporate Parent ABB Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent ABB Inc. for ABB Inc.. (Sipprelle, Keith) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant Carrier Corporation's Answer to Complaint and Crossclaim against ABB, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against ABB Inc. byCarrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Conformed Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - 2004 ABB-Carrier Agreement [Executed])(Ingram, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Carrier Corporation identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Carrier Corporation. (Ingram, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Carrier Corporation identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Carrier Corporation. (Ingram, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 15, 2019 Answer filed by ABB, Inc. in Superior Court of California, County of Alameda on July 15, 2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG 19022034. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13519586). Filed byCarrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - All Pleadings filed in State Case, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ingram, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/15/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Fire Insurance Company v. Carrier Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly Michelle Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Allan Peterson
Represented By: Keith Andrew Sipprelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Lubomyr Bohdan Jeans-Berezowsky
Represented By: Mark Charles Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?