East Bay Sanctuary Covenant et al v. Barr et al Featured Case

Several civil rights groups sued the Trump administration, challenging a new rule that would severely limit the asylum protections available under US and international law to migrants at the US-Mexico border.

Plaintiff: Central American Resource Center, Innovation Law Lab, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant and Al Otro Lado
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, John P. Sanders, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, James McHenry and U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Amicus Curiae: Blaine Bookey and Former BIA Members, Former Immigration Law Judges, and Law Professors
Case Number: 4:2019cv04073
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Angelica Salceda Notice of Withdrawal Christine P. Sun as Counsel (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 85 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar finding as moot 77 Motion to Stay.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice (joint notice concerning service and deadlines) (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 83 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Al Otro Lado, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab, Central American Resource Center. All Defendants. (Eiland, Katrina) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 82 Joint Statement Concerning Defendants' Emergency Stay Motion by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2019 Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/5/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Eiland, Katrina) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER The Court notes Defendants' emergency motion to stay the Court's preliminary injunction order pending appeal. ECF No. 77 . Although Defendants have not filed a motion for order shortening time, the Court on its own motion orders Plaintiffs to file an opposition by September 13, 2019. The Court will then take the matter under submission without a hearing. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 10, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 79 Summons Issued as to David L. Anderson, U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of California. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 78 USCA Case Number 19-16773 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 75 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Matthew T. Albence, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, William Barr, U.S. Department of Justice, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, James McHenry, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin K. McAleenan, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, John P. Sanders. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 77 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 73 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (CORRECTED) filed by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2019 09:30 AM in Oakland, Chambers before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/24/2019. Replies due by 10/1/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 76 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 73 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2019 09:30 AM in Oakland, Chambers before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/24/2019. Replies due by 10/1/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice. Appeal of Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 73 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 74 Proposed Summons. (Eiland, Katrina) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 73 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 57 Motion to Consider Supplemental Evidence and Restore the Nationwide Scope of Injunction.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 72 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/05/19, before Judge Tigar. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 71 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 9/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2019. (Related documents(s) 71 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/05/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Genova, Francesca) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 70 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 68 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 9/5/2019. re 57 Emergency MOTION to Consider Supplemental Evidence and Restore the Nationwide Scope of Injunction filed by East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab, Central American Resource Center, Al Otro Lado. Argument heard from both parties. Motion taken under submission. Written order to issue.Total Time in Court: 35 minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Hebel. Plaintiff Attorney: Lee Gelernt, Julie Veroff, Katrina Eiland, Morgan Russell. Defendant Attorney: Scott Stewart. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/5/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 68 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal portions of ECF 65-1 and 65-3 filed by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit EOIR Guidance, redacted, #4 Exhibit EOIR Guidance, unredacted, #5 Exhibit ICE Guidance, redacted, #6 Exhibit ICE Guidance, unredacted)(Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/4/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2019 Filing 67 REPLY (re #57 Emergency MOTION to Consider Supplemental Evidence and Restore the Nationwide Scope of Injunction ) filed byAl Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 30, 2019 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Document includes redacted pages. A written request must be filed to seal documents. Please see Local Rules 79-5 and re-file in its entirety. Re: #66 Errata, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Matthew T. Albence, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, William Barr, U.S. Department of Justice, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, James McHenry, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin K. McAleenan, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, John P. Sanders, #65 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Matthew T. Albence, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, William Barr, U.S. Department of Justice, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, James McHenry, Kevin K. McAleenan, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Executive Office for Immigration Review, John P. Sanders (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 66 ERRATA re #65 Opposition/Response to Motion,, (substituting attached documents in place of Exhibits B in ECF 65-2)) by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. B (USCIS Guidance), #2 Exhibit Ex. B (USCIS Guidance))(Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 8/29/2019) Modified on 8/30/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2019 Filing 65 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #57 Emergency MOTION to Consider Supplemental Evidence and Restore the Nationwide Scope of Injunction ) (corrected, with exhibits) filed byMatthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (EOIR Guidance), #2 Exhibit Ex. B (USCIS Guidance), #3 Exhibit Ex. C (ICE Guidance))(Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 8/29/2019) Modified on 8/30/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).***ATTACHMENT 2 RE-FILED AT DKT. #66 ***
August 29, 2019 Filing 64 **RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. #65 ** OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #57 Emergency MOTION to Consider Supplemental Evidence and Restore the Nationwide Scope of Injunction ) filed byMatthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice. (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 8/29/2019) Modified on 8/30/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2019 Filing 63 Supplemental Brief re #57 Emergency MOTION to Consider Supplemental Evidence and Restore the Nationwide Scope of Injunction filed byAl Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Related document(s) #57 ) (Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 62 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019:Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEFThe Non-Profit Organizations and Law School Clinics' motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief, ECF No. 60, is granted without objection. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar)
August 19, 2019 Filing 60 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Non-Profit Organizations and Law School Clinics filed by Blaine Bookey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Bookey, Blaine) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 19, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER of USCA as to #46 Notice of Appeal 19-16487, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Matthew T. Albence, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, William Barr, U.S. Department of Justice, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, James McHenry, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin K. McAleenan, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, John P. Sanders. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 57 Emergency MOTION to Consider Supplemental Evidence and Restore the Nationwide Scope of Injunction filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. Responses due by 8/21/2019. Replies due by 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO Motion, #2 Supplemental Manning Declaration, #3 Supplemental Smith Declaration, #4 Ramos Declaration, #5 Alvarez Declaration, #6 Reichlin-Melnick Declaration, #7 Proposed Order)(Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER of USCA as to #46 Notice of Appeal 19-16487, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Matthew T. Albence, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, William Barr, U.S. Department of Justice, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, James McHenry, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin K. McAleenan, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, John P. Sanders. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief for Dismissal for Lack of Jurisdiction submitted by Duane Morley Cox. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING STAY PENDING APPEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 51 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #47 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #42 Order on Motion for TRO, ) filed byAl Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar. The Court hereby GRANTS the government's #48 emergency motion to shorten time. Plaintiffs shall file their response to the #47 motion for a stay pending appeal by 12:00 p.m. on July 31, 2019. The Court will then take the matter under submission. The Court intends to rule on the motion for a stay by 12:00 p.m. on August 2, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 49 USCA Case Number 19-16487 U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit for #46 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Matthew T. Albence, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, William Barr, U.S. Department of Justice, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, James McHenry, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin K. McAleenan, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, John P. Sanders. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 48 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time For Decision on Motion to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 47 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Order Pending Appeal re #42 Order on Motion for TRO filed by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 8/12/2019. Replies due by 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice. Appeal of Order on Motion for TRO, #42 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 7/29/2019) USCA Number 19-16487 Modified on 7/29/2019 (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2019 Filing 45 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-24-2019, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #41 Transcript Order, #40 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2019. (Related documents(s) #41 , #40 ) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mary Bauer.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Melissa Crow. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar re: #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/24/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/24/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Kisor, Colin) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 7/24/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar regarding motion for temporary restraining order #3 . Hearing held and argument heard. The matter is taken under submission and the Court shall issue a written order ruling on the motion. Total Time in Court: 63 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Lee Gelernt, Julie Veroff, Melissa Crow, Bahar Azmy, Katrina Eiland, Vasudha Talla, Angelica Salceda, and Spencer Amdur. Defendant Attorneys: Scott Stewart and Erez Reuveni. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Mary Bauer, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13547247) filed by East Bay Sanctuary Covenant. (Crow, Melissa) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Melissa Crow, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13547242) filed by East Bay Sanctuary Covenant. (Crow, Melissa) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: MEDIA PARTICIPATION. Members of the press wishing to listen to the proceedings scheduled for July 24, 2019, shall contact CourtCall at 1-866-582-6878 to make arrangements to do so. Recording of the hearing is prohibited. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Angelica Salceda (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 21, 2019 Filing 33 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #32 filed by Marienna Murch. Responses due by 8/5/2019. Replies due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit)(Murch, Marienna) (Filed on 7/21/2019) Modified on 8/1/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2019 Filing 32 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by East Bay Sanctuary Covenant. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 8/5/2019. Replies due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Murch, Marienna) (Filed on 7/21/2019)
July 21, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY (re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order) filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 7/21/2019)
July 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDERBecause the Government has now produced the administrative record and both parties will be able to rely upon it in making their arguments, and in order both to promptly provide clarity regarding the legality of the challenged regulation and to facilitate the parties' ability to seek appellate review should they so wish, the Court will inquire at the July 24, 2019 hearing whether there is any reason it should not construe Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order as a motion for preliminary injunction. See Four Seasons Hotels And Resorts, B.V. v. Consorcio Barr, S.A., 320 F.3d 1205, 1210 n.3 (11th Cir. 2003) ("The district court may convert a hearing for a temporary restraining order into a hearing for a preliminary injunction as long as the adverse party had notice of the hearing."); Voth v. Mills, No. CV 09-423-HA, 2010 WL 1640401, at *1 (D. Or. Apr. 19, 2010) (converting motion for temporary restraining order to motion for preliminary injunction "on the basis that defendants were given notice and an opportunity to respond to the [m]otion"). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Tigar, Jon) (Filed on 7/20/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE filed by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice of Filing of the Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 1, #2 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 2, #3 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 3, #4 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 4, #5 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 5, #6 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 6, #7 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 6, #8 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 8, #9 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 9)(Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 28 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Omar Jadwat.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Defendants Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, John P. Sanders, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security & U.S. Department of Justice. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 25 Proposed Summons. (Eiland, Katrina) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Omar Jadwat, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13537122) filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Jadwat, Omar) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott G. Stewart (Stewart, Scott) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Anand Balakrishnan.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Anand Balakrishnan, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13533138) filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Balakrishnan, Anand) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice to Lee Gelernt. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER UNSEALING DOCKET. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 18, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER. Responses due by 7/19/2019 by 5:00 PM. Replies due by 7/21/2019 by 5:00 PM. Administrative record due by 7/23/2019 at 5:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 18, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Patricia Sun (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Vasudha Talla (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Telephone Conference held on 7/18/2019. Parties are to meet and confer regarding the Temporary Restraining Order briefing and submit a proposed schedule by noon today. Proposed Schedule due by 7/18/2019 by 12:00 PM PST.Total Time in Court: 30 minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Lee Gelernt, Melissa Crow, Julie Veroff, Bahar Azmy, Katrina Eiland. Defendant Attorney: Erez Reuveni. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar per related case order. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 17, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing re #13 Order Relating Case Telephone Conference set for 7/18/2019 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Chambers before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RELATING CASES 18-cv-06810-JST and 19-cv-04073-WHO. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 17, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur (Amdur, Spencer) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody H. Wofsy (Wofsy, Cody) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Michelle Veroff (Veroff, Julie) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Lee Gelernt, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13528529) filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erez R. Reuveni (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab.. (Eiland, Katrina) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO Motion for TRO, #2 Declaration Smith Declaration, #3 Declaration Pinheiro Declaration, #4 Declaration Manning Declaration, #5 Declaration Sharp Declaration, #6 Declaration Frydman Declaration, #7 Declaration Anker and Hathaway Declaration, #8 Proposed Order)(Eiland, Katrina) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/30/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Immigration Action) against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13523432). Filed by Innovation Law Lab, Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Eiland, Katrina) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Immigration Action) against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13523432). Filed by Innovation Law Lab, Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Eiland, Katrina) (Filed on 7/16/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East Bay Sanctuary Covenant et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Represented By: Colin A. Kisor
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Sanders
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Represented By: Colin A. Kisor
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Represented By: Colin A. Kisor
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Represented By: Colin A. Kisor
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Represented By: Colin A. Kisor
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Represented By: Colin A. Kisor
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Represented By: Colin A. Kisor
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Represented By: Colin A. Kisor
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Represented By: Colin A. Kisor
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Represented By: Colin A. Kisor
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McHenry
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Represented By: Colin A. Kisor
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Represented By: Colin A. Kisor
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central American Resource Center
Represented By: Katrina Leigh Eiland
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Melissa E Crow
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Julie Michelle Veroff
Represented By: Christine Patricia Sun
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Angelica Salceda
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovation Law Lab
Represented By: Katrina Leigh Eiland
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Melissa E Crow
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Julie Michelle Veroff
Represented By: Christine Patricia Sun
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Angelica Salceda
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Bay Sanctuary Covenant
Represented By: Katrina Leigh Eiland
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Melissa E Crow
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Julie Michelle Veroff
Represented By: Christine Patricia Sun
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Angelica Salceda
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Otro Lado
Represented By: Katrina Leigh Eiland
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Melissa E Crow
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Julie Michelle Veroff
Represented By: Christine Patricia Sun
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Angelica Salceda
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Blaine Bookey
Represented By: Blaine Meredith Bookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Former BIA Members, Former Immigration Law Judges, and Law Professors
Represented By: Marienna Harnden Murch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?