Shoclef, Inc. v. Khalid et al
Plaintiff: Shoclef, Inc.
Defendant: Smart Coders (SMC) Pvt. Ltd. and Umer Khalid
Case Number: 4:2019cv04221
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The court has reviewed Plaintiff's response to the order to show cause. The order to show cause is discharged. Plaintiff's motion for permission for electronic case filing #5 is terminated as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/30/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Response to #6 Order to Show Cause for Non-Compliance with Local Rule 3-9(b) by Shoclef, Inc. (Chang, Hung) (Filed on 8/29/2019) Modified on 8/29/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Hung Chang on behalf of Plaintiff Shoclef, Inc. (Chang, Hung) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ordered to respond in writing to explain why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply. Show Cause Response due by 9/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/21/19. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Shoclef, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/21/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Umer Khalid, Smart Coders (SMC) Pvt. Ltd. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2019 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400; Receipt No. 34611143753). Filed by Shoclef, Inc. Consent/Declination due by 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/25/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoclef, Inc. v. Khalid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart Coders (SMC) Pvt. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umer Khalid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoclef, Inc.
Represented By: Hung Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?