Scott, Jr. v. I.C. System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Darryl A. Scott, Jr.
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive, I.C. System, Inc., TransUnion, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04292
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Miller, Debra) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #29 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by I.C. System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellyin, Tamar) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #27 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials HSG immediately after the case number. No furthe r action is necessary. Re: #27 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by I.C. System, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by I.C. System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellyin, Tamar) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 26 Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 8/28/2019) Modified on 8/29/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2019 Filing 25 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by I.C. System, Inc. re #24 Answer to Complaint (Ellyin, Tamar) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint byI.C. System, Inc.. (Ellyin, Tamar) (Filed on 8/27/2019) Modified on 8/28/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:19-cv-04292-HSG. Re:[ 23] Answer to Complaint filed by TransUnion, LLC. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses byTransUnion, LLC. (Miller, Debra) (Filed on 8/21/2019) Modified on 8/22/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for October 29, 2019, is continued to November 5, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by October 29, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #20 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (docket no. 1). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Proposed Order is missing suffix to Judge's Name. Counsel need not re-file document, but should reference Hon. Judge Ha ywood S. Gilliam, Jr. in future filings if they wish to include reference to Judge's full assignment reference. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this entry. Re: #20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Darryl A. Scott, Jr. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to re #1 Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Darryl A. Scott, Jr. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 8/20/2019) Modified on 8/20/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/20/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Christine Davidson for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for October 29, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by October 22, 2018. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-04292-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darryl A. Scott, Jr.. I.C. System, Inc. served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/14/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by TransUnion, LLC.. (Miller, Debra) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darryl A. Scott, Jr.. TransUnion, LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darryl A. Scott, Jr.. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Debra A. Miller. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13595893.) filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Miller, Debra) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by TransUnion, LLC identifying Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. (Streza, David) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David James Streza (Streza, David) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., I.C. System, Inc., TransUnion, LLC. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Proposed), #2 Summons (Proposed))(Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., I.C. System, Inc., TransUnion, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13555780.). Filed byDarryl A. Scott, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 7/26/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott, Jr. v. I.C. System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.C. System, Inc.
Represented By: Brett B Goodman
Represented By: Tamar Gabriel Ellyin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Debra A. Miller
Represented By: David James Streza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey Christine Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl A. Scott, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Brooks Sabb Veggian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?