In the Matter of Oregon Sealark, LLC
Plaintiff: Oregon Sealark, LLC and Brusco Tug & Barge Inc
Claimant: Unnamed Claimants
Case Number: 4:2019cv04305
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Marine
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 Statement re #2 Ex Parte Application for Issuance of Monition and Injunction of Any Further Action or Claim; Issuing Notice; and Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation of Value by Brusco Tug & Barge Inc, Oregon Sealark, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Survey and Decl of Surveyor Capt. Richard Shaw, #2 Exhibit Proof of Filing of Security, #3 Exhibit Complaint in State Court, #4 Exhibit Email, #5 Exhibit Email)(Wootton, Richard) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED Order for Supplemental Documentation. The court's order for supplemental documentation #10 is amended for court administrative purposes. There is no additional action required by the parties.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/24/2019. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 Receipt in the amount of $1,000.00 from Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP, receipt #34611144851, receipt date 09/23/2019. (palsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Supplemental Documentation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/17/2019. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brusco Tug & Barge Inc, Oregon Sealark, LLC.. (Tribolet, Christopher) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Brusco Tug & Barge Inc, Oregon Sealark, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Greg Galli, Other Affiliate Galli, Minor Child of Greg, Other Affiliate Gery, Michael, Other Affiliate Larry Leidelmeyer, Other Affiliate Francisco Villapando, Other Affiliate Minor Child Villapando for Brusco Tug & Barge Inc, Oregon Sealark, LLC. (Luk, Galin) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all interested entities. This filin g will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #5 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Brusco Tug & Barge Inc, Oregon Sealark, LLC. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Brusco Tug & Barge Inc, Oregon Sealark, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Luk, Galin) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brusco Tug & Barge Inc, Oregon Sealark, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Tribolet, Christopher) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Brief re #2 Ex Parte Application for Issuance of Monition and Injunction of Any Further Action or Claim; Issuing Notice; and Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation of Value filed byBrusco Tug & Barge Inc, Oregon Sealark, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Complaint for Exoneration from, or Limitation of, Liability, #2 Affidavit Plaintiffs-in-Limitation Ad Interim Stipulation of Value, #3 Proposed Order Directing Issuance of Monition and Injunction; Issuing Notice; and Approving Ad Interim Stipulation of Value, #4 Supplement Notice of Deposit of Security for Costs)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Wootton, Richard) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Ex Parte Application for Issuance of Monition and Injunction of Any Further Action or Claim; Issuing Notice; and Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation of Value filed by Brusco Tug & Barge Inc, Oregon Sealark, LLC. (Wootton, Richard) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Admiralty for Exoneration from, or Limitation of Liability against Unnamed Claimants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13557327.). Filed byOregon Sealark, LLC, Brusco Tug & Barge Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wootton, Richard) (Filed on 7/26/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of Oregon Sealark, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Sealark, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Tribolet
Represented By: Richard Craig Wootton
Represented By: Galin G. Luk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brusco Tug & Barge Inc
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Tribolet
Represented By: Richard Craig Wootton
Represented By: Galin G. Luk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Unnamed Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?