HSM Holdings, LLC v. Mantu I.M. Mobile LTD. et al
Plaintiff: HSM Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Beezz Communications Solutions LTD, Eran Hamo, Eran Ben Eliezer, Gavriel George Niryaev, Michael Raskansky, Joseph Cayre, Denis Jdanov, Mantu I.M. Mobile LTD. and Brams Jacob Moyal
Case Number: 4:2019cv04391
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byHSM Holdings, LLC. (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS CAYRE AND MOYAL'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 29, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule on Defendants Cayre and Moyal's Motion to Dismiss filed by HSM Holdings, LLC, Joseph Cayre and Brams Jacob Moyal. (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/28/2019) Modified on 8/29/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019:Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kristin Cope.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing. Case Management Statement due by 11/26/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2019 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 10/23/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (Related documents(s) #12 )(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/15/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 Declaration of Brams Jacob Moyal in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byJoseph Cayre, Brams Jacob Moyal. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 Declaration of Joseph Cayre in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byJoseph Cayre, Brams Jacob Moyal. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Gavriel George Niryaev in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byJoseph Cayre, Brams Jacob Moyal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #12 ) (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Joseph Cayre, Brams Jacob Moyal. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 8/28/2019. Replies due by 9/4/2019. (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kristin Cope ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13611509.) filed by HSM Holdings, LLC. (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by HSM Holdings, LLC.. (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSM Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sotech LLC for HSM Holdings, LLC. and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Acker Shapiro (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Beezz Communications Solutions LTD, Eran Ben Eliezer, Eran Hamo, Denis Jdanov, Mantu I.M. Mobile LTD., Gavriel George Niryaev, Michael Raskansky. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/14/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Cayre re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Notice of Removal, (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Joseph Cayre (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Joseph Cayre . (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTIONS 1332, 1441 AND 1446 from Superior Court of California County of Alameda. Their case number is RG19024693. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13569172). Filed byJoseph Cayre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 7/31/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSM Holdings, LLC v. Mantu I.M. Mobile LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beezz Communications Solutions LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eran Hamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eran Ben Eliezer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavriel George Niryaev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Raskansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Cayre
Represented By: Carol Lynn Thompson
Represented By: Wesley M Chao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis Jdanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mantu I.M. Mobile LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brams Jacob Moyal
Represented By: Carol Lynn Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSM Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Collins Cope
Represented By: Jonathan Acker Shapiro
Represented By: Jonathan A Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?