Lopez v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fumiko Lopez
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04577
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re: Eric Roberts. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re: Raj Shah. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fumiko Lopez re #38 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/4/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Beth L. Freeman no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 36 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/3/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2019 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman and Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for Discovery. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Eric M. Roberts on behalf of Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13666930.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Roberts, Eric) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Raj N. Shah on behalf of Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13666845.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Shah, Raj) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Catherine Fitzsimmons (Fitzsimmons, Amanda) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Ord, Isabelle) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 27 Statement DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED R. CIV. P. 7.1 by Apple, Inc.. (Ord, Isabelle) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Apple, Inc.. (Ord, Isabelle) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Ord, Isabelle) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by Fumiko Lopez #21 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fumiko Lopez. Apple, Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Comite, Erin) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fumiko Lopez.. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by Fumiko Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Lopez, #2 Proposed Order)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Hal Davis Cunningham (Cunningham, Hal) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Joseph P. Guglielmo Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #17 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Erin Green Comite Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #16 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13617837.) filed by Fumiko Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Guglielmo, Joseph) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13617806.) filed by Fumiko Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Comite, Erin) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Ian W. Sloss Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #12 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Christian Levis Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #11 . Signed Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Vincent Briganti Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs #10 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13604312.) filed by Fumiko Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sloss, Ian) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13604291.) filed by Fumiko Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Levis, Christian) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13604281.) filed by Fumiko Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Briganti, Vincent) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE. Plaintiff to file a motion for appointment of guardian ad litem for minor plaintiff by 8/22/2019. Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/22/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/21/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT Regarding Proper Venue by Fumiko Lopez. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fumiko Lopez (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Fumiko Lopez . (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13589012.). Filed by Fumiko Lopez. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 8/7/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Isabelle Louise Ord
Represented By: Amanda Catherine Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Eric Roberts
Represented By: Raj N. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fumiko Lopez
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Represented By: Eric Somers
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Hal Davis Cunningham
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?