Dominguez v. Bush et al
Plaintiff: Elijah Dominguez
Defendant: Joe Biden, George Soros, George Bush, Jr. and Barack Obama
Case Number: 4:2019cv04793
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/24/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Elijah Dominguez. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: The Court has received a declination by filed Plaintiff in this case. However, the form is not signed or dated. The Court requests Plaintiff complete the form in its entirety documenting either consent or request for reassignment and file it with the Court by 9/12/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2019: #1 CORRECTED Certificate/Proof of Service with signature affixed) (mklS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/29/2019 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elijah Dominguez.Document Not Signed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Received Document: NOTICE OF A LAWSUIT AND REQUEST TO WAIVE SERVICE OF A SUMMONS Documents not signed by Elijah Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Dismissing Complaint with Leave to Amend. Amended Complaint due by 9/20/2019. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2019 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 All Judges Standing Order)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Elijah Dominguez. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joe Biden, George Bush, Jr, Barack Obama, George Soros. (IFPP) No Process. Filed byElijah Dominguez. Consent/Declination due by 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez v. Bush et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Soros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Bush, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barack Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?