Beatty v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Frederick James Beatty
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee for RALI 2006-QA11, PHH Mortgage Corporation and Western Progressive, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv05145
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2019 re #8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and/or Unavailable Remedies. For the reasons stated on the record, the motion is granted. ***Motions terminated: #8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due by 10/24/2019. FTR Time: 1:31-1:57. Attachment: Civil Law and Motion Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/10/2019 1:31:32 PM ]. File Size [ 12232 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:25:29 ]. (courtspeak).
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and/or Unavailable Remedies; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byDeutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee for RALI 2006-QA11, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Fu, Xiyi) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and/or Unavailable Remedies; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byFrederick James Beatty. (Fitzpatrick, Brenna) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Frederick James Beatty.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Fitzpatrick, Brenna) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Judicial Notice re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and/or Unavailable Remedies; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byDeutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee for RALI 2006-QA11, PHH Mortgage Corporation and Western Progressive, LLC. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Fu, Xiyi) (Filed on 8/23/2019) Modified on 9/11/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and/or Unavailable Remedies; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee for RALI 2006-QA11, PHH Mortgage Corporation and Western Progressive, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2019 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 9/6/2019. Replies due by 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Fu, Xiyi) (Filed on 8/23/2019) Modified on 9/11/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee for RALI 2006-QA11, PHH Mortgage Corporation and Western Progressive, LLC. (Fu, Xiyi) (Filed on 8/22/2019) Modified on 9/11/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee for RALI 2006-QA11, PHH Mortgage Corporation re #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Fu, Xiyi) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee for RALI 2006-QA11, PHH Mortgage Corporation re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Fu, Xiyi) (Filed on 8/20/2019) Modified on 9/11/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/3/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee for RALI 2006-QA11, PHH Mortgage Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee for RALI 2006-QA11; Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for PHH Mortgage Corporation. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Fu, Xiyi) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand (no process) from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is SCV-264821. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13623951). Filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee for RALI 2006-QA11, Western Progressive, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fu, Xiyi) (Filed on 8/19/2019) Modified on 8/20/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beatty v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas as Trustee for RALI 2006-QA11
Represented By: Xiyi Fu
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Xiyi Fu
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive, LLC
Represented By: Xiyi Fu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick James Beatty
Represented By: Duncan M. Nefcy
Represented By: Brenna Wood Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?