Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Zenisco, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Sharhokh Riahinezhad, Zenisco, Inc., Shahrooz Taebi and 3S Network, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv05198
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Relief; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Sharhokh Riahinezhad, Zenisco, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 11/1/2019. Replies due by 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS ZENISCOS AND SHAHROKH RIAHINEZHADS MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF)(Cummins, Michael) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Shahrooz Taebi. (Related documents(s) #17 )(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Entry of Default of Shahrooz Taebi filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of GailAnn Y. Stargardter)(Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 3S Network, Inc. (Related documents(s) #14 )(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Sharhokh Riahinezhad served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Default of 3S Network, Inc. filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of GailAnn Y. Stargardter)(Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Zenisco, Inc. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for November 26, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by November 19th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-05198-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 toJudge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/5/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Atain Specialty Insurance Company.. (Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. 3S Network, Inc. served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company. Shahrooz Taebi served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to 3S Network, Inc., Sharhokh Riahinezhad, Shahrooz Taebi, Zenisco, Inc.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/4/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Atain Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AJK Holdings, LLC for Atain Specialty Insurance Company. re #1 Complaint, (Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3S Network, Inc., Sharhokh Riahinezhad, Shahrooz Taebi, Zenisco, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13630649.). Filed byAtain Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stargardter, GailAnn) (Filed on 8/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Zenisco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharhokh Riahinezhad
Represented By: Michael J. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenisco, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shahrooz Taebi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3S Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: GailAnn Y. Stargardter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?