Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. v. Bay Area Air Quality Management District
Plaintiff: Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Bay Area Air Quality Management District
Case Number: 4:2019cv05277
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by Bay Area Air Quality Management District and Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (Green, John) (Filed on 10/18/2019) Modified on 10/18/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOHN D. GREEN OF FARELLA BRAUN + MARTEL ON BEHALF OF BAY AREA AIR QUALITY MANAGEMENT DISTRICT by Bay Area Air Quality Management District (Green, John) (Filed on 10/18/2019) Modified on 10/18/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSTION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by Bay Area Air Quality Management District and Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (Freid, Joel) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Corre ct initials are: "JST."Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #12 Certificate of Service filed by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. on Bay Area Air Quality Mgmt Dist. (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 08/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Bay Area Air Quality Management District. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 8/26/2019) Modified on 8/26/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/6/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amtrust Financial Services, Inc. for Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.. LR 3-15 Certificate (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amtrust Financial Services, Inc. for Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 8/23/2019) Modified on 8/26/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief (with jury demand) against Bay Area Air Quality Management District (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-13641808). Filed by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Underlying Complaint, #2 Exhibit Policy, #3 Exhibit Letter, #4 Exhibit Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jacobus, Alan) (Filed on 8/23/2019) Modified on 8/26/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. v. Bay Area Air Quality Management District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Palmer Jacobus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Air Quality Management District
Represented By: Joel Freid
Represented By: John D Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?