Choon's Design, LLC v. ContextLogic, Inc.
Plaintiff: CHOON'S DESIGN, LLC
Defendant: CONTEXTLOGIC, INC d/b/a WISH and ContextLogic Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv05300
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #21 Stipulation to Set a Briefing Schedule for Anticipated Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Motions due by 10/23/2019; Responses due by 11/18/2019; Replies due by 12/4/2019; Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Set a Briefing Schedule for Anticipated Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by ContextLogic Inc. and Choon's Design, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Lauter in Support)(Crittenden, John) (Filed on 10/11/2019) Modified on 10/15/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by ContextLogic Inc. (Crittenden, John) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Judd D. Lauter (Lauter, Judd) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitty Somvichian (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Crittenden (Crittenden, John) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Choon's Design, LLC (Certificate of Service of Judge Gilliam's Standing Order) (Gresham, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Choon's Design, LLC. ContextLogic Inc. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Gresham, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stuart L. Cochran. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bruce W. Steckler. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Stuart L. Cochran) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13717399.) filed by Choon's Design, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Missouri Certificate of Good Standing)(Cochran, Stuart) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Choon's Design, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Choon's Design, LLC for Choon's Design, LLC. (Gresham, R.) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to R. Dean Gresham. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Bruce W. Steckler) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13680520.) filed by Choon's Design, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BWS - Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit BWS - Louisiana Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit BWS - Missouri Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit BWS - Pennsylvania Certificate of Good Standing)(Steckler, Bruce) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (R. Dean Gresham) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13677649.) filed by Choon's Design, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RDG - Certificate of Good Standing - OK, #2 Exhibit RDG - Certificate of Good Standing - Texas)(Gresham, R.) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to ContextLogic Inc.. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Neilson, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Lisa J. Frisella. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on #1 Complaint filed by Choon's Design, LLC. Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Neilson, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against CONTEXTLOGIC, INC d/b/a WISH ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13644546.). Filed byCHOON'S DESIGN, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Neilson, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/23/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choon's Design, LLC v. ContextLogic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHOON'S DESIGN, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Dawn Neilson
Represented By: Lisa Jean Frisella
Represented By: Bruce W. Steckler
Represented By: R. Dean Gresham
Represented By: Stuart Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTEXTLOGIC, INC d/b/a WISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ContextLogic Inc.
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Represented By: John W. Crittenden
Represented By: Judd D. Lauter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?