Pauline et al v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 302 et al
Plaintiff: Dan Pauline and Banister Electrical, Inc.
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 302, Tom Hansen, Dawson Electric and Crockett Electric
Case Number: 4:2019cv05527
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 20 Brief re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings filed byDawson Electric. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Rodriguez, Bianca) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Order re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings by Dawson Electric. (Rodriguez, Bianca) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Dawson Electric. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 11/13/2019. Replies due by 11/20/2019. (Rodriguez, Bianca) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, In the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Tom Hansen, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 302. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 11/13/2019. Replies due by 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Tom Hansen in Support of Union Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and, In the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment and, In the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Goldsmith, Eileen) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 09/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Crockett Electric.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Rockwell, Ray) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Banister Electrical, Inc., Dan Pauline.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Theiring, Robert) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dawson Electric re #10 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Rodriguez, Bianca) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dawson Electric.. (Rodriguez, Bianca) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tom Hansen, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 302.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Goldsmith, Eileen) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tom Hansen, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 302 (Goldsmith, Eileen) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 11 /27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/19/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court by Tom Hansen, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 302. (Goldsmith, Eileen) (Filed on 9/4/2019) Modified on 9/5/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2019 Answer to Removal Complaint #1 by Tom Hansen, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 302. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Answer to Removal Complaint #1 by Dawson Electric. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Answer to Removal Complaint #1 by Crockett Electric. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tom Hansen, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 302 (Goldsmith, Eileen) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Zoe Louise Palitz (Palitz, Zoe) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen B. Goldsmith (Goldsmith, Eileen) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California Superior Court, Contra Costa County. Their case number is C-19-01560. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13669583). Filed byTom Hansen, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 302. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldsmith, Eileen) (Filed on 9/3/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pauline et al v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 302 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Pauline
Represented By: Robert Laurence Theiring
Represented By: Jason Michael Murphy,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banister Electrical, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Laurence Theiring
Represented By: Jason Michael Murphy,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 302
Represented By: Eileen B. Goldsmith
Represented By: Zoe Louise Palitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Hansen
Represented By: Eileen B. Goldsmith
Represented By: Zoe Louise Palitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawson Electric
Represented By: Bianca Monique Rodriguez
Represented By: Richard N. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crockett Electric
Represented By: Ray Thomas Rockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?