Patterson v. Rosendin Electric, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sterling Patterson
Defendant: Rosendin Electric, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv05529
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by Sterling Patterson, Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Aiwazian, Edwin) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/11/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/10/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosendin Electric, Inc. of New Case Documents (Zielinski, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement d ue by 11/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rosendin Electric, Inc... (Zielinski, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Not More than Thirty (30) Days filed by Rosendin Electric, Inc.. (Zielinski, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/6/2019) Modified on 9/6/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/19/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Declaration of Cliff Thompson in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byRosendin Electric, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Zielinski, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of Kenneth J. Zielinski in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byRosendin Electric, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Zielinski, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Cases by Rosendin Electric, Inc. (Zielinski, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/6/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rosendin Electric, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rosendin Holdings, Inc. for Rosendin Electric, Inc.. (Zielinski, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rosendin Electric, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rosendin Holdings, Inc. for Rosendin Electric, Inc.. (Zielinski, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-577539. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13669886). Filed by Rosendin Electric, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Zielinski, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/6/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Rosendin Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosendin Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth James Zielinski
Represented By: Brian Christopher Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Patterson
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?