Hernandez Pablo v. Koumans et al
Plaintiff: Santos Hernandez Pablo
Defendant: mark koumans and John Kramar
Case Number: 4:2019cv05551
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Allowing Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint filed by Mark Koumans, John Kramar, and Santos Hernandez Pablo. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 11/1/2019) Modified on 11/1/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Koumans, John Kramar.. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Santos Hernandez Pablo.. (Kaplunovsky, Eliyahu) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/18/2019. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2019. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mark Koumans, John Kramar.(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/18/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Kaplunovsky, Eliyahu) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13673658). Filed bySantos Hernandez Pablo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaplunovsky, Eliyahu) (Filed on 9/4/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez Pablo v. Koumans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mark koumans
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kramar
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Hernandez Pablo
Represented By: Eliyahu Yuli Kaplunovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?