Mechanics Bank v. Citibank Delaware
Plaintiff: Mechanics Bank
Defendant: CITIBANK DELAWARE
Case Number: 4:2019cv05608
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCitibank Delaware. (Alvarez, Douglas) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byMechanics Bank. (Cronin, Brian) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Citibank Delaware.. (Alvarez, Douglas) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Whitworth (Whitworth, Alexandra) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Marie Talbot (Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/18/2019. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Citibank Delaware re #11 Certificate of Interested Entities, #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Alvarez, Douglas) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citibank Delaware identifying Corporate Parent Citicorp, Corporate Parent CitiGroup, Inc. for Citibank Delaware. (Alvarez, Douglas) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Citibank Delaware. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 10/24/2019. Replies due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alvarez, Douglas) (Filed on 10/10/2019) Modified on 10/11/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mechanics Bank re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Cronin, Brian) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 #Electronic filing error. No title Page Re: #8 Certificate of Service filed by Mechanics Bank. Proof of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, requires a title pa ge. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 regarding first page requirement. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mechanics Bank re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Cronin, Brian) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mechanics Bank.. (Cronin, Brian) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/8/2019. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Citibank Delaware. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/20/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cronin, Brian) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITIBANK DELAWARE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13679139.). Filed byMechanics Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronin, Brian) (Filed on 9/5/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mechanics Bank v. Citibank Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechanics Bank
Represented By: Brian David Cronin, Croni
Represented By: Tom Roddy Normandin
Represented By: Brian David Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIBANK DELAWARE
Represented By: Tracy Marie Talbot
Represented By: Alexandra Whitworth
Represented By: Douglas Antonio Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?