Coletti et al v. Apple Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Hedicker, Rodolfo Cabrera, M. Gail Sundell, Kimberly Modesitt, Nathan Cooper, Krystle Faeryn, Kathleen Boggs, Catherine Goodwin, Ariana Ryan, Becky Wellington, Paul Coletti, Victor Perlman, Brandy Davis, William Zide, Nancy Maekawa and Mark Kunze
Defendant: Apple Inc. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv05707
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 37 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(a), filed by Apple Inc., Kathleen Boggs, Rodolfo Cabrera, Paul Coletti, Nathan Cooper, Brandy Davis, Krystle Faeryn, Catherine Goodwin, David Hedicker, Mark Kunze, Nancy Maekawa, Kimberly Modesitt, Victor Perlman, Ariana Ryan, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., M. Gail Sundell, Becky Wellington, William Zide (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/14/2019) Modified on 10/15/2019 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Winthrop, Douglas) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Amisha R. Patel.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Amisha R. Patel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13770054.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Patel, Amisha) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2020 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mark Cheffo.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christina Guerola Sarchio.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert J. Katerberg.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Elisabeth S. Theodore.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Elizabeth A. Fegan. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 10/03/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/3/19. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 25 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong re [ #23 Order of Recusal. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/2/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Mark Cheffo ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13757620.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cheffo, Mark) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Christina Guerola Sarchio ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13757554.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sarchio, Christina) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kathleen Boggs, Rodolfo Cabrera, Paul Coletti, Nathan Cooper, Brandy Davis, Krystle Faeryn, Catherine Goodwin, David Hedicker, Mark Kunze, Nancy Maekawa, Kimberly Modesitt, Victor Perlman, Ariana Ryan, M. Gail Sundell, Becky Wellington, William Zide (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Robert J. Katerberg ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13753034.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Katerberg, Robert) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Elisabeth S. Theodore ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13753007.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Theodore, Elisabeth) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Andrew Winthrop on Behalf of Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Winthrop, Douglas) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc... (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Apple Inc. for Apple Inc.. and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Defendant Apple Inc. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Tam OF COUNSEL (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kathleen Boggs, Rodolfo Cabrera, Paul Coletti, Nathan Cooper, Brandy Davis, Krystle Faeryn, Catherine Goodwin, David Hedicker, Mark Kunze, Nancy Maekawa, Kimberly Modesitt, Victor Perlman, Ariana Ryan, M. Gail Sundell, Becky Wellington, William Zide re #10 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kathleen Boggs, Rodolfo Cabrera, Paul Coletti, Nathan Cooper, Brandy Davis, Krystle Faeryn, Catherine Goodwin, David Hedicker, Mark Kunze, Nancy Maekawa, Kimberly Modesitt, Victor Perlman, Ariana Ryan, M. Gail Sundell, Becky Wellington, William Zide.. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth A. Fegan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13724045.) filed by Kathleen Boggs, Rodolfo Cabrera, Paul Coletti, Nathan Cooper, Brandy Davis, Krystle Faeryn, Catherine Goodwin, David Hedicker, Mark Kunze, Nancy Maekawa, Kimberly Modesitt, Victor Perlman, Ariana Ryan, M. Gail Sundell, Becky Wellington, William Zide. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Fegan, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings RE #7 Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/12/19. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants. Filed byMark Kunze, Nancy Maekawa, Victor Perlman, Krystle Faeryn, Paul Coletti, Nathan Cooper, David Hedicker, Rodolfo Cabrera, Kathleen Boggs, Ariana Ryan, M. Gail Sundell, Becky Wellington, Catherine Goodwin, Brandy Davis, Kimberly Modesitt, William Zide. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** WRONG CASE please see correct #3 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13692267.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 9/10/2019) Modified on 9/11/2019 (as, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 9/11/2019, (counsel error *** e-mail sent to court regarding error ***) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 9/12/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coletti et al v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hedicker
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Cabrera
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Gail Sundell
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Modesitt
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Cooper
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystle Faeryn
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Boggs
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Goodwin
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariana Ryan
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Wellington
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Coletti
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Perlman
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Davis
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Zide
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Maekawa
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Kunze
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Christina Guerola Sarchio
Represented By: Jonathan S. Tam
Represented By: Amisha Rajni Patel
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Katerberg
Represented By: Elisabeth Susan Theodore
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Winthrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?