Navarre et al v. General Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Navarre, Rhonda Cole and Thea Sonnier
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, Ingersol-Rand Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Honeywell International, Inc., General Electric Company, Crane Co., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Syd Carpenter Marine Contractors, Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., CBS Corporation, Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation and Foster Wheeler Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv05738
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by John Edward Rosenthal (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Rosenthal, John) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Milbrodt (Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Milbrodt (Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Lynn Crochet (Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Lynn Crochet (Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Eric Meislin (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Meislin, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Blaise Adams (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Adams, Joseph) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Reno Cross (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Cross, Reno) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 6, 2019 #Electronic filing error. [err101] Each Attorney must E-File Their Own Notice of Appearance. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entire ty Re: #46 Notice of Appearance filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Reno Cross HOPEMAN BROTHERS INC.'S AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Cross, Reno) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byParker-Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Proof of Service)(Adams, Joseph) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #34 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by CBS Corporation. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo for Defendant General Electric Company (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner for Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon for Defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGeneral Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson for Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo for Defendant CBS Corporation (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner for Defendant CBS Corporation (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon for Defendant CBS Corporation (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by CBS Corporation (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCBS Corporation. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson for Defendant CBS Corporation (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 30 Rule 7.1 Disclosures and Certificate of Interested Entities by Honeywell International, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bendix Corporation, Other Affiliate State Street Bank & Trust for Honeywell International, Inc. (Yang, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/30/2019) Modified on 10/31/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #22 Rule 7.1 Disclosures and Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Honeywell International, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #25 Notice of Appearance filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 29 INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE RULE 26(A)(1) filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Cross, Reno) (Filed on 10/29/2019) Modified on 10/30/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance of Robert S. Kraft by Reno Cross. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Cross, Reno) (Filed on 10/29/2019) Modified on 10/30/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2019 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Cross, Reno) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Aspericueta, Erika) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 25 ***WRONG PDF ATTACHED, SEE DOCKET #28 FOR CORRETED ENTRY*** NOTICE of Appearance by Reno Cross (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Cross, Reno) (Filed on 10/29/2019) Modified on 10/30/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice Truong Wong (Wong, Alice) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 23 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY*** Rule 7.1 Disclosures and Certificate of Interested Entities by Honeywell International, Inc. (Yang, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/29/2019) Modified on 10/30/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2019 Filing 22 Rule 7.1 Disclosures and Certificate of Interested Entities by Honeywell International, Inc. (Yang, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/29/2019) Modified on 10/30/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Yang (Yang, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint byHoneywell International, Inc.. (Yang, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Park (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Park, Charles) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Park, Charles) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amec Foster Wheeler PLC for Foster Wheeler LLC. re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Park, Charles) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byFoster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Park, Charles) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byHopeman Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Cross, Reno) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ingersol-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand PLC for Ingersol-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (with Jury Demand) by Ingersol-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 10/23/2019) Modified on 10/24/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Syd Carpenter Marine Contractors, Inc. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand bySyd Carpenter Marine Contractors, Inc.. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/19/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/1819. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/17/209. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Ingersol-Rand Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Syd Carpenter Marine Contractors, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge William Orrick on 9/13/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pamela Navarre.. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pamela Navarre (Donadio, David) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Survival, Wrongful Death - Asbestos; Demand For Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13699825.). Filed byThea Sonnier, Rhonda Cole, Pamela Navarre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donadio, David) (Filed on 9/12/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarre et al v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Blaise Adams
Represented By: Marte J. Bassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersol-Rand Company
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Erika Aspericueta
Represented By: Lisa Marie Petrovsky
Represented By: Steven John Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Truong Wong
Represented By: Jonathan Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Blaise Adams
Represented By: John Edward Rosenthal
Represented By: Jonathan Eric Meislin
Represented By: Reno Cross
Represented By: Robert Stanley Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter Marine Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Kenneth Bruce Prindle
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Navarre
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Cole
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thea Sonnier
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?