Marroquin Ambriz v. Barr et al
Defendant: Richard Valeika, Sheriff Wendell Anderson, William P. Barr and Kevin McAleenan
Petitioner: Daniel Marroquin Ambriz
Case Number: 4:2019cv05791
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S JUDGMENT.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 28, 2019. (jstlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Hearing on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus held on 10/23/2019. Motion taken under submission. Written order to issue.Total Time in Court: 27 minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney: Nayna Gupta. Defendant Attorney: Adrienne Zack. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/23/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 Traverse byDaniel Marroquin Ambriz. (Gupta, Nayna) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 EXHIBIT 1 *(CD)* re [12-18] Declaration of Adrienne Zack filed byWendell Anderson, William P. Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Richard Valeika. (Related document(s) #12 ) (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus byWendell Anderson, William P. Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Richard Valeika. Traverse due by 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Burgus, #2 Declaration of Deportation Officer Reyes, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Declaration of Adrienne Zack, #19 Exhibit 1)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING TRAVERSE DUE DATE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Traverse due by 10/9/2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #9 Stipulation. Hearing set for 10/23/2019 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Habeas Answer due by 10/4/2019. Traverse due by 10/23/2019.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule and Hearing filed by Wendell Anderson, William P. Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Richard Valeika and Daniel Marroquin Ambriz. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/24/2019) Modified on 9/25/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/24/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wendell Anderson, William P. Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Richard Valeika.. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Zack (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Daniel Marroquin Ambriz. (Gupta, Nayna) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 ***DISREGARD, SEE DKT. 4 ***Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) Modified on 9/17/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Immigration Habeas Case) (Filing Fee: $5.00, receipt number 0971-13709063). Filed by Daniel Marroquin Ambriz. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A-H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gupta, Nayna) (Filed on 9/16/2019) Modified on 9/17/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marroquin Ambriz v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Valeika
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Wendell Anderson
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Marroquin Ambriz
Represented By: Nayna Gupta
Represented By: Brendon DeWayne Woods
Represented By: Su Yon Yi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?