Moore et al v. Notre Dame de Namur University
Plaintiff: Lee Strawn and John S Moore, III
Defendant: Notre Dame de Namur University
Case Number: 4:2019cv05936
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #10 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court filed by John S Moore, III, Lee Strawn. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 12, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court ) filed byJohn S Moore, III, Lee Strawn. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brandler, Polina) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court ) filed byNotre Dame de Namur University. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael J. Vartain, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Michael J. Vartain, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Vartain, Michael) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #11 Stipulation for Plaintiff's Counsel to Appear by Phone.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Plaintiff's Counsel to Appear by Phone filed by John S Moore, III, Lee Strawn and Notre Dame de Namur University. (Hammond, Julian) (Filed on 10/11/2019) Modified on 10/11/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court filed by John S Moore, III, Lee Strawn. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/22/2019. Replies due by 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cherniak, Ari) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2020 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John S Moore, III, Lee Strawn.. (Cherniak, Ari) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/26/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/8/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Notre Dame de Namur University (Attachments: #1 Notice To Adverse Party Of Removal To Federal Court, #2 Proof of Service)(Vartain, Michael) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Notre Dame de Namur University (Vartain, Michael) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo Superior Court. Their case number is 19CIV04765. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13729369). Filed byNotre Dame de Namur University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vartain, Michael) (Filed on 9/23/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Notre Dame de Namur University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Notre Dame de Namur University
Represented By: Michael Joseph Vartain
Represented By: Kathryn J. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Strawn
Represented By: Julian Ari Hammond
Represented By: Ari Nathan Cherniak
Represented By: Polina Brandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John S Moore, III
Represented By: Julian Ari Hammond
Represented By: Ari Nathan Cherniak
Represented By: Polina Brandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?