Scott v. Robertson et al
Plaintiff: Donnie Scott
Defendant: Jim Robertson, Eric Golding and Devinder Kumar
Case Number: 4:2019cv06046
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CHC
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
2 Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/25/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Donnie Scott. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Donnie Scott. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under The Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. Section 1984; Request for Jury Trial (no process) against Eric Golding, Devinder Kumar, and Jim Robertson, (Filing Fee: Ifpp entered on 9/25/2019). Filed by Donnie Scott. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Robertson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Golding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devinder Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?