Carrero v. Holbrook
Petitioner: Luke J. Carrero
Respondent: David J. Holbrook
Case Number: 4:2019cv06110
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE regarding case transferred in from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of USCA re #1 Petition. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Luke J. Carrero. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Luke J. Carrero. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019) Modified on 9/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byLuke J. Carrero. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrero v. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David J. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luke J. Carrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?