Connor, M.D. v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, et al.
Plaintiff: Caroline L. Connor, M.D.
Defendant: UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA and Humboldt Medical Specialists, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan
Case Number: 4:2019cv06552
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Robert M Illman
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Vollmer, Stephanie) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with no byUNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Vollmer, Stephanie) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 1:00 PM. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2020 WILL BE HELD AT 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. The 2:00 PM time is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Vollmer (Vollmer, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caroline L. Connor, M.D. re #7 Summons Issued UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Horrow, Michael) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 1/13/2020 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America to Respond to Initial Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Caroline L. Connor, M.D. (Maguire, Daniel) (Filed on 11/5/2019) Modified on 11/6/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Caroline L. Connor, M.D. re #12 Certificate of Service (Horrow, Michael) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 ***DISREGARD. DOCUMENT FILED IN INCORRFECT CASE PER FILER. SEE DOCKET #13 FOR CORRECT FILING.*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caroline L. Connor, M.D. re #1 Complaint, (Horrow, Michael) (Filed on 10/25/2019) Modified on 10/28/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Caroline L. Connor, M.D... (Horrow, Michael) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Humboldt Medical Specialists, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2020 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. Parties may participate in the Initial Case Management Conference by telephone and should contact Judge Illman's courtroom deputy for instructions. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Document not properly linked. Civil Cover Sheet should be part of Complaint. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No fu rther action is necessary. Re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Caroline L. Connor, M.D. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/25/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request)(Horrow, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Caroline L. Connor, M.D. re #1 Complaint, (Horrow, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Caroline L. Connor, M.D. . (Horrow, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Humboldt Medical Specialists, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13787671.). Filed byCaroline L. Connor, M.D.. (Horrow, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connor, M.D. v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline L. Connor, M.D.
Represented By: Michael B. Horrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel William Maguire, Esq.
Represented By: Stephanie A. Vollmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humboldt Medical Specialists, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?