Edwards Lifesciences Corporation et al v. Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Edwards Lifesciences Corporation and Edwards Lifesciences LLC
Defendant: Meril, Inc. and Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2019cv06593
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
2 Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Motion Hearing held on 10/28/2021 re #180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC, #195 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Protective Order Dispute Regarding Plaintiff's Expert Nimesh Desai filed by Edwards Lifesciences LLC, #177 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b) filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. Supplemental Brief due by 11/4/2021. Response due by 11/12/2021.Recorded via Zoom: 1:35-2:35. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/28/2021)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER REGARDING 7/30/21 #181 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/27/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2021) Modified on 10/28/2021 (wft, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER REGARDING 9/10/2021 #202 , #203 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/27/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER RE HEARING ON 10/28/2021. The parties should be prepared to discuss the pending joint discovery letters at tomorrow's hearing on the renewed motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/27/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER TERMINATING 8/18/21 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER re #192 , Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/26/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2021) Modified on 10/27/2021 (wft, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion for Sanctions re #177 Hearing set for 10/28/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (Related documents(s) #177 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021) Modified on 10/26/2021 (wft, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying #224 Motion for Leave to File. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING Dkt. No. #255 Motion to Strike Meril's Untimely Daubert Motions. The Court SETS the following schedule re Dkt. Nos. #247 Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Nimesh Desai, M.D., Ph.D. and Joseph Bavaria, M.D. and #250 Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Michael Wagner. Plaintiffs' opposition is due by November 11, 2021, and Defendants may file a reply by November 18, 2021. The hearings previously scheduled for February 24, 2022 are advanced to January 18, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor to be held with the Pretrial Conference, if not decided on the papers before then. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting #223 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH EDWARDS' ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF RENEWED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 37(B). (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC re #257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Horne, Brian) (Filed on 10/19/2021)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Brief [REDACTED] of Defendants to Preclude Certain Testimony of Michael Wagner (modified redactions) filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 to Ware Declaration [REDACTED], #2 Exhibit 10 to Ware Declaration [REDACTED])(Horne, Brian) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Horne, #2 Declaration of Ryan Lindsey, #3 Proposed Order, #4 [REDACTED] Meril Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Wagner (with modified redactions), #5 [REDACTED] Exhibit 7 to Ware declaration (with modified redactions), #6 [REDACTED] Exhibit 10 to Ware declaration (with modified redactions), #7 [SEALED] Meril Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Wagner (with modified redactions), #8 [SEALED] Exhibit 7 to Ware declaration (with modified redactions), #9 [SEALED] Exhibit 10 to Ware declaration (with modified redactions))(Horne, Brian) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MOTION to Strike Meril's Untimely Daubert Motions [Dkt. Nos. 247 and 250] filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 11/1/2021. Replies due by 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Edwards' Motion to Strike Meril's Untimely Daubert Motions [Dkt. Nos. 247 and 250])(Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings as to #247 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of Nimesh Desai, M.D., Ph.D. and Joseph Bavaria, M.D. and #250 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of Michael Wagner , See Docket No. #255 : Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Renotice motion hearing re #250 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of Michael Wagner , #247 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of Nimesh Desai, M.D., Ph.D. and Joseph Bavaria, M.D. filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Related document(s) #250 , #247 ) (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court takes the pending #208 motion to preclude certain testimony of Robert Vigil and the #210 motion for partial summary judgment filings under submission. The hearings previously scheduled for October 21st at 2:00 p.m. are vacated. The Court will issue a written order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Thomas McMichael (McMichael, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NOS. #247 AND #250 . Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re-file the motions. Hearing dates of November 18, 2021, are vacated. The briefing schedules remain in effect. Counsel are directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motions for new hearing dates. November 18th was not the Court's next available hearing date when these motions were e-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. re #249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Defendants Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd. and Meril, Inc.'s Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Michael Wagner (Ware, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of Michael Wagner filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/28/2021. Replies due by 11/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Ware in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ware Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Ware Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Ware Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Ware Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Ware Declaration, #7 [SEALED] Exhibit 6 to Ware Declaration Placeholder, #8 [SEALED] Exhibit 7 to Ware Declaration Placeholder, #9 Exhibit 8 to Ware Declaration, #10 [SEALED] Exhibit 9 to Ware Declaration Placeholder, #11 [SEALED] Exhibit 10 to Ware Declaration Placeholder, #12 [SEALED] Exhibit 11 to Ware Declaration Placeholder, #13 Proposed Order)(Ware, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Defendants Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd. and Meril, Inc.'s Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Michael Wagner filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Ware in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [SEALED] Exhibit 6 to Ware Declaration in Support of Meril Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Michael Wagner, #4 [SEALED] Exhibit 7 to Ware Declaration in Support of Meril Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Michael Wagner, #5 [SEALED] Exhibit 9 to Ware Declaration in Support of Meril Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Michael Wagner, #6 [SEALED] Exhibit 10 to Ware Declaration in Support of Meril Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Michael Wagner, #7 [SEALED] Exhibit 11 to Ware Declaration in Support of Meril Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Michael Wagner, #8 [REDACTED VERSION] Meril Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Michael Wagner, #9 [UNREDACTED VERSION] Meril Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Michael Wagner)(Ware, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. re #246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Nimesh Desai, M.D., Ph.D. and Joseph Bavaria, M.D. (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of Nimesh Desai, M.D., Ph.D. and Joseph Bavaria, M.D. filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/28/2021. Replies due by 11/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #4 [SEALED] Exhibit C to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #5 [SEALED] Exhibit D to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #7 F to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #12 Proposed Order)(Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Nimesh Desai, M.D., Ph.D. and Joseph Bavaria, M.D. filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [SEALED] Exhibit C to the Declaration of Melanie Mayer iso Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Desai and Bavaria, #4 [SEALED] Exhibit D to the Declaration of Melanie Mayer iso Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Desai and Bavaria, #5 [REDACTED VERSION] Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Nimesh Desai, M.D., Ph.D. and Joseph Bavaria, M.D., #6 [UNREDACTED VERSION] Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Nimesh Desai, M.D., Ph.D. and Joseph Bavaria, M.D.)(Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 OBJECTIONS to re #240 Reply to Opposition/Response, [Objections to New Evidence and Argument Submitted in Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Summary Judgment Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-3(d)(1)] by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Sustaining Objections to New Evidence and Argument Submitted in Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Summary Judgment Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-3(d)(1))(Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 10/11/2021)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Connection With Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #2 Declaration of Ashok Thakkar in Support, #3 Proposed Order, #4 [REDACTED VERSION] Exhibit B to Declaration of Steven Hanle iso Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #5 [SEALED VERSION] Exhibit B to Declaration of Steven Hanle iso Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #6 [REDACTED VERSION] Exhibit C to Declaration of Steven Hanle iso Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #7 [SEALED VERSION] Exhibit C to Declaration of Steven Hanle iso Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #8 [REDACTED VERSION] Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #9 [SEALED VERSION] Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 10/11/2021)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC re #239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. Notice of Attorney Withdrawal of Chieh Tung (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 REPLY (re #210 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Hanle, #2 Exhibit A [Under Seal], #3 Exhibit B [Under Seal], #4 Exhibit C [Under Seal], #5 Exhibit D)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Stephens, #2 Exhibit A [Under Seal], #3 Exhibit B [Under Seal], #4 Exhibit C [Under Seal], #5 Exhibit D [Under Seal], #6 Exhibit E [Public/Redacted], #7 Proposed Order)(Stephens, Matthew) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 REPLY (re #208 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil ) filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Horne)(Horne, Brian) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC re #235 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Horne, Brian) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #208 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil ) Modified Redactions to Meril Opposition [Docket No. 229] filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Modified Redactions to Exhibit 3 to Ware Declaration [Docket No. 229])(Horne, Brian) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Horne, #2 Declaration of Ryan Lindsey, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Meril Opposition to Edwards Motion to Preclude Vigil Testimony, #5 Redacted Exhibit 3 to Ware Declaration, #6 Unredacted Meril Opposition to Edwards Motion to Preclude Vigil Testimony, #7 Unredacted Exhibit 3 to Ware Declaration)(Horne, Brian) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing reset from 10/21/2021 to 10/28/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/kaw General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #224 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief ISO Renewed Motion for Sanctions ) filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Melanie Mayer)(Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Declaration of Ashok Thakkar in Support of #223 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Re Edwards Admin Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief ISO Renewed Motion for Sanctions filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Related document(s) #223 ) (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support of #223 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Re Edwards Admin Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief ISO Renewed Motion for Sanctions filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Related document(s) #223 ) (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #177 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b). Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. re #228 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Meril's Opposition to Edwards' Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil (Ware, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #208 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil ) filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Ware in Support, #2 [REDACTED VERSION] Exhibit 1 to Ware Declaration, #3 [SEALED] Exhibit 2 to Ware Declaration Placeholder, #4 [REDACTED VERSION] Exhibit 3 to Ware Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Ware Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Ware Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Ware Declaration)(Ware, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Meril's Opposition to Edwards' Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Ware in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [UNREDACTED VERSION] Opposition to Edwards' Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil, #4 [REDACTED VERSION] Opposition to Edwards' Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil, #5 [UNREDACTED VERSION] Exhibit 1 to Ware Decl. ISO Opposition to Edwards' Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil, #6 [REDACTED VERSION] Exhibit 1 to Ware Decl. ISO Opposition to Edwards' Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil, #7 [SEALED] Exhibit 2 to Ware Decl. ISO Opposition to Edwards' Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil, #8 [UNREDACTED VERSION] Exhibit 3 to Ware Decl. ISO Opposition to Edwards' Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil, #9 [REDACTED VERSION] Exhibit 3 to Ware Decl. ISO Opposition to Edwards' Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil)(Ware, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. re #225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Connection with Defendants Meril Sciences Pvt. Ltd. and Meril Inc.'s Opposition to Edwards' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #210 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nilay Lad in Support, #2 Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #4 [SEALED] Exhibit B to Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #8 [REDACTED VERSION] Exhibit F to Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #9 [REDACTED VERSION] Exhibit G to Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support)(Hadden, J.) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Connection with Defendants Meril Sciences Pvt. Ltd. and Meril Inc.'s Opposition to Edwards' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 of Melanie Mayer in Support, #2 of Ashok Thakkar in Support, #3 Proposed Order, #4 [SEALED] Exhibit B to Declaration of Melanie Mayer iso Opposition to Edwards' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #5 [REDACTED VERSION] Exhibit F to Declaration of Melanie Mayer iso Opposition to Edwards' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #6 [UNREDACTED VERSION] Exhibit F to Declaration of Melanie Mayer iso Opposition to Edwards' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #7 [REDACTED VERSION] Exhibit G to Declaration of Melanie Mayer iso Opposition to Edwards' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #8 [UNREDACTED VERSION] Exhibit G to Declaration of Melanie Mayer iso Opposition to Edwards' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #9 [REDACTED VERSION] Opposition to Edwards' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #10 [UNREDACTED VERSION] Opposition to Edwards' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Hadden, J.) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief ISO Renewed Motion for Sanctions filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Supplemental Brief - REDACTED, #2 Declaration of S. Hanle ISO Supplemental Brief - REDACTED, #3 Exhibit A - placeholder only, #4 Exhibit B - placeholder only, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D - placeholder only, #7 Exhibit E - placeholder only, #8 Exhibit F - placeholder only, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I - placeholder only, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Supp. Brief)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Re Edwards Admin Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief ISO Renewed Motion for Sanctions filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Stephens ISO Admin Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order on Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Proposed Supplemental Brief, #4 Un-Redacted Version of Proposed Supplemental Brief, #5 Redacted Version of Hanle Decl ISO Motion for Leave to File Supp. Brief, #6 Un-Redacted Version of Hanle Decl ISO Motion for Leave to File Supp. Brief, #7 Exhibit A - under seal, #8 Exhibit B - under seal, #9 Exhibit D - under seal, #10 Exhibit E - under seal, #11 Exhibit F - under seal, #12 Exhibit I - under seal)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Order signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne-Marie D. Dao (Dao, Anne-Marie) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING #200 LEAVE TO FILE SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND STRIKING #214 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Edwards' Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil (Dkt. 208) filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michelle E. Irwin, #2 Declaration of Nilay Lad, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3)(Irwin, Michelle) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DOCUMENTS IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFFS' PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DKT. #209 filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashok Thakkar in Support, #2 Declaration of Chieh Tung in Support, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Declaration [REDACTED VERSION] Declaration of Carlo F. Van den Bosh in Support of Edwards Lifesciences Corporation's and Edwards Lifesciences LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #5 [UNREDACTED VERSION] Declaration of Carlo F. Van den Bosh in Support of Edwards Lifesciences Corporation's and Edwards Lifesciences LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #6 [REDACTED VERSION] Exhibit 27 to Van den Bosch Declaration ISO Edwards Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #7 [UNREDACTED VERSION] Exhibit 27 to Van den Bosch Declaration ISO Edwards Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 9/20/2021) Modified on 9/21/2021 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Declaration of Ryan Lindsey in Support of #213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Connection With Motion of Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd. and Meril, Inc. for Summary Judgment of No Damages filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Related document(s) #213 ) (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Damages; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 9/30/2021. Replies due by 10/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nilay Lad in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Nilay Lad, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Nilay Lad, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Nilay Lad, #5 Declaration of Jeffrey Ware in Support, #6 [SEALED] Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware, #7 [SEALED] Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware, #8 [SEALED] Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware, #9 [SEALED] Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware, #10 [SEALED] Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware, #11 [SEALED] Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware, #12 [SEALED] Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware, #13 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware, #14 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware, #15 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware, #16 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware, #17 Proposed Order)(Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Connection With Motion of Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd. and Meril, Inc. for Summary Judgment of No Damages filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chieh Tung in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [REDACTED VERSION] of Motion for Summary Judgment of No Damages, #4 [UNREDACTED VERSION] of Motion for Summary Judgment of No Damages, #5 [SEALED] Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of No Damages, #6 [SEALED] Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of No Damages, #7 [SEALED] Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of No Damages, #8 [SEALED] Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of No Damages, #9 [SEALED] Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of No Damages, #10 [SEALED] Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of No Damages, #11 [SEALED] Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Jeffrey Ware in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of No Damages)(Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC Plaintiffs' Certificate of Service Re Unredacted Version of Documents(s) Sought to be Sealed (Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 EXHIBITS re #210 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Exhibits 15-28 to Declaration of Carlo F. Van den Bosch ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Related document(s) #210 ) (Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 9/30/2021. Replies due by 10/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Bavaria ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Nimesh D. Desai, M.D. ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration of Louise Duckworth ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Declaration of Carlo F. Van den Bosch (Redacted), #5 Exhibit Exhibits 1-14 to Declaration of Carlo F. Van den Bosch, #6 Proposed Order)(Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gazal Pour-Moezzi ISO Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Redacted Version of Declaration of Carlo F. Van den Bosch ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #5 Unredacted Version of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #6 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Carlo F. Van den Bosch ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 1 to Van den Bosch Declaration, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 12 to Van den Bosch Declaration, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 17 to Van den Bosch Declaration, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 19 to Van den Bosch Declaration, #11 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 23 to Van den Bosch Declaration, #12 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 25 to Van den Bosch Declaration, #13 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 26 to Van den Bosch Declaration, #14 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 27 to Van den Bosch Declaration)(Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MOTION to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 9/30/2021. Replies due by 10/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brian C. Horne in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 2 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 3 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Order)(Horne, Brian) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Connection with Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Robert Vigil filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brian C. Horne in Support, #2 Declaration Declaration of Ryan Lindsey in Support, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit [SEALED] Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Brian C. Horne in Support of Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, #5 Exhibit [SEALED] Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Brian C. Horne in Support of Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, #6 Exhibit [SEALED] Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Brian C. Horne in Support of Plaintiff's Daubert Motion)(Horne, Brian) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Declaration of Ashok Thakkar in Support of #202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter To Re Merils Responses To Edwards' Request For Production of Documents, Set Five filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Related document(s) #202 ) (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that the hearing on #177 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b), previously set for 9/16/2021, is continued to 10/21/2021 at 01:30 PM - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #177 )(kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC re #202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter To Re Merils Responses To Edwards' Request For Production of Documents, Set Five (Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 REDACTION to #202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter To Re Merils Responses To Edwards' Request For Production of Documents, Set Five by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter To Re Merils Responses To Edwards' Request For Production of Documents, Set Five filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gazal Pour-Moezzi, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Joint Letter, #4 Unredacted Version of Joint Letter)(Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #200 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Second Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Second Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. Responses due by 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Ware in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Ware, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #197 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Michelle E. Irwin. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Horne (Horne, Brian) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michelle E. Irwin ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16342047.) filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Irwin, Michelle) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Sapna S. Mehta (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Protective Order Dispute Regarding Plaintiff's Expert Nimesh Desai filed by Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Nimesh Desai, #2 Declaration of Dr. Ashok Thakkar)(Lea, Christy) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING #190 PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH EDWARDS REPLY RE: RENEWED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 37(B) signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support of #190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal In Connection With Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support of Renewed Motion For Sanctions filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Related document(s) #190 ) (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc., Edwards Lifesciences Corporation and Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 8/18/2021) Modified on 8/19/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 REPLY (re #190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #177 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b) ) filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply Brief, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply Brief, #5 Redacted Version of S Hanle Declaration, #6 Unredacted Version of S Hanle Declaration)(Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting #185 MERIL'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS RELATING TO MERIL'S OPPOSITION TO RENEWED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Allen Ware (Ware, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #177 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b) ) filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #8 Declaration of Ashok Thakkar in Support, #9 [SEALED] Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ashok Thakkar in Support)(Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Meril's Opposition to Renewed Motion for Sanctions filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #2 Declaration of Ashok Thakkar in Support, #3 Proposed Order, #4 [REDACTED VERSION] Opposition to Edwards' Renewed Motion for Sanctions, #5 [UNREDACTED VERSION] Opposition to Edwards' Renewed Motion for Sanctions, #6 [SEALED] Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ashok Thakkar in Support of Opposition to Edwards' Renewed Motion for Sanctions)(Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting #180 EDWARDS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER RE: EDWARDS' DESIGNATED EXPERT.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting #176 APLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH EDWARDS' RENEWED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 37(B).(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER REGARDING UNUSABLE CHAMBERS COPY re #177 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b) filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. Plaintiffs shall lodge a usable copy by 8/9/2021. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/4/2021. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021) Modified on 8/9/2021 (kawlc1, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christy Lea, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [REDACTED] Joint Letter re Discovery Dispute, #4 [UNREDACTED] Joint Letter re Discovery Dispute)(Lea, Christy) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Declaration of Ashok Thakkar in Support of #176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Motion for Sanctions, Portions of Declaration in support and Exhibit A filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Related document(s) #176 ) (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER REQUIRING CHAMBERS COPIES of #177 MOTION for Sanctions, #176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Pursuant to General Order 78, the courtesy copy requirement in the local rules is suspended pending further notice, unless a judge orders otherwise in a specific case. Accordingly, the filing party shall lodge a chambers copy of #176 , #177 , and all related documents and tabbed exhibits, if applicable, within 7 days of this order. The chambers copies must comply with both Civil Local Rule 79-5(d)(2) and Para. 5 of the undersigned's standing order, available at: https://cand.uscourts.gov/kaw-standing-order_-general-rev07152021/ Additionally, the parties shall lodge chambers copies of all briefing pertaining to this pending motion within 3 days of filing. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/26/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b) filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 8/6/2021. Replies due by 8/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A (placeholder only), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Proposed Order)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Motion for Sanctions, Portions of Declaration in support and Exhibit A filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion for Sanctions, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion for Sanctions, #5 Redacted Version of Decl ISO Motion for Sanctions, #6 Unredacted Version of Decl ISO Motion for Sanctions, #7 Unredacted Exhibit A)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING Dkt. No. #173 the parties' request to amend case schedule and continue trial. The Court encourages the parties to continue to engage in settlement discussion but is not persuaded that a 120-day extension of case deadlines is warranted. The Court will consider a renewed request to stay or continue case deadlines if and when the parties file a notice of settlement. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ERRATA re #173 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Case Schedule and Continue Trial by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Case Schedule and Continue Trial filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Rolando Aquino for Plaintiffs Edwards Lifesciences Corporation and Edwards Lifesciences LLC (Aquino, Adam) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Christy Green Lea for Plaintiffs Edwards Lifesciences Corporation and Edwards Lifesciences LLC (Lea, Christy) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER REGARDING #164 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 37. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/20/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING. Notice is hereby given that the Court takes the pending #146 Motion for Sanctions under submission. The hearing previously scheduled for May 20, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. is vacated. The Court will issue a written order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #161 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Declaration of Narendra Patel in Support of #161 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Related document(s) #161 ) (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Declaration of Ashok Thakkar in Support of #161 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Related document(s) #161 ) (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Declaration of Chieh Tung in Support of #161 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Related document(s) #161 ) (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 REPLY (re #146 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b) ) filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carlo F. Van Den Bosch ISO, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carlo F. Van Den Bosch, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Carlo F. Van Den Bosch, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Carlo F. Van Den Bosch, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Carlo F. Van Den Bosch, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Carlo F. Van Den Bosch)(Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER REGARDING 3/16/21 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER RE CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATION #127 by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC of the Unredacted Documents Sought Filed Under Seal in Connection with Edwards' Reply In Support of Its Motion for Rule 37(b) Sanctions (Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Edwards' Reply ISO Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b), #4 Redacted Version of Edwards' Reply ISO Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b), #5 Exhibit A to the Supplemental Declaration of Carlo F. Van Den Bosch ISO Reply, #6 Under Seal Version of Exhibit A to the Supplemental Declaration of Carlo F. Van Den Bosch ISO Reply)(Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER re 148 Order Requiring Chambers Copies. The Court received a deficient chambers copy of Plaintiff's #146 motion for sanctions. It did not include the supporting declarations or exhibits. It has been recycled. Plaintiff is ordered to provide a compliant chambers copy, with tabbed exhibits, that also complies with Civil Local Rule 79-5(d)(2) (highlighted redacted portions subject to sealing) within 5 days of this order. The failure to timely lodge a compliant chambers copy may result in the hearing date being continued to a date convenient to the undersigned. Additionally, Defendant shall lodge a chambers copy of its #156 opposition, and supporting declarations and exhibits, that clearly identifies the proposed redactions. Plaintiff is also ordered to lodge a chambers copy of the reply brief. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/16/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #155 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #146 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b)), filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #4 [SEALED] Exhibit C to Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support, #5 Declaration of Ashok Thakkar in Support)(Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Meril's Opposition to Motion for Sanctions filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chieh Tung in Support, #2 Declaration of Ashok Thakkar in Support, #3 Proposed Order, #4 [SEALED] Exhibit C to the Declaration of Melanie Mayer)(Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING #107 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; DENYING #108 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; DENYING #120 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND GRANTING ( #119 , #123 , #129 , and #137 ) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Declaration of Ashok Thakkar in Support of #145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal In Connection with Edwards' Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b) filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Related document(s) #145 ) (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Declaration of Chieh Tung in Support of #145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal In Connection with Edwards' Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b) filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Related document(s) #145 ) (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #139 Stipulation.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 REPLY (re #120 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ) filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve Hanle In Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support of #139 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #139 ) (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER REQUIRING CHAMBERS COPIES. Pursuant to General Order 72-6, the courtesy copy requirement in the local rules is suspended pending further notice, unless a judge orders otherwise in a specific case. Accordingly, the filing party shall lodge a chambers copy of #146 MOTION for Sanctions, and related documents and tabbed exhibits within 5 days of this order. The chambers copy must comply with Para. 5 of the undersigned's standing order, available at: https://cand.uscourts.gov/kaw_standing_order_general_2_11_2021/ Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/31/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC of Unredacted Documents Sought to be Sealed (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b) filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 4/14/2021. Replies due by 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carlo E. Van Den Bosch In Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b))(Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal In Connection with Edwards' Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 37(b) filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D to the Declaration of Carlo E. Van Den Bosch, #4 Redacted Version of Exhibit D to the Declaration of Carlo E. Van Den Bosch)(Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #135 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #120 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ) filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie L. Mayer, #2 Exhibit A - Sharma 2019)(Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER re #139 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC, Meril, Inc. The parties shall file a supporting declaration within 7 days of this order. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/25/2021. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc., Edward Lifesciences Corporation, and Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 3/24/2021) Modified on 3/25/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents In Connection With Plaintiffs' Opposition to Meril's Motion to Seal (Dkt. 129-4) filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chieh Tung in Support, #2 Declaration of Narendra Patel in Support, #3 Proposed Order, #4 [REDACTED VERSION] of Plaintiffs' Opposition, #5 [UNREDACTED VERSION] of Plaintiffs' Opposition)(Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents In Connection With Joint Statement Re Confidentiality Designation (Dkt. 127) filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chieh Tung in Support, #2 Declaration of Narendra Patel in Support, #3 Proposed Order, #4 [SEALED] Exhibit A to Joint Statement, #5 [REDACTED VERSION] of Joint Statement, #6 [UNREDACTED VERSION] of Joint Statement)(Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Letter from J. David Hadden to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 [SEALED] Attachment 1 to Exhibit B)(Hadden, J.) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Meril's Letter to Judge Kandis A. Westmore filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chieh Tung in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [SEALED] Attachment 1 to Exhibit B)(Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #123 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal In Connection With Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. 120) ) filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Stephens ISO, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order Order Denying Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Dkt. No. 123])(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC of Unredacted and Under Seal Documents Sought to be Sealed (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents In Connection with Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Opposition To Defendants Administrative Motion To File Documents Under Seal In Connection With Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 123), #4 Redacted Version of Opposition To Defendants Administrative Motion To File Documents Under Seal In Connection With Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 123))(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER REGARDING 1/27/21 JOINT LETTER RE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #115 by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Discovery Letter Briefre Confidentiality Designation filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Letter Brief)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC of Unredacted and Under Seal Documents Sought to be Sealed (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Dispute Letter Brief and in Conformance with Civil Local Rule 79-5(D) filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Joint Statement re Confidentiality Designations, #4 Redacted Version of Joint Statement re Confidentiality Designations, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit A)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal In Connection With Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. 120) filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chieh Tung in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [REDACTED] Exhibit A to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens, #4 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit A to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens, #5 [REDACTED] Exhibit B to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens, #6 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit B to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens, #7 [SEALED] Exhibit C to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens)(Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Letter from J. David Hadden to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore dated March 15, 2021 and Exhibit A. (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #120 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Responses due by 3/25/2021; Replies due by 4/1/2021, and Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, before Judge Haywood S.Gilliam Jr. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC of Unredacted Documents Sought to be Sealed (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Stephens, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens, #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens, #7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens, #8 Proposed Order)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal In Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and In Conformance with Civil L.R. 79-5(D) filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of the Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Under Seal, #4 Redacted Version of the Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Under Seal, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens In Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens In Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens In Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Matthew Stephens In Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Letter from J. David Hadden to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore dated March 10, 2021. (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ***DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR BY FILER. RE-FILED AT DOC #118 ***Letter from J. David Hadden to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore dated March 10, 2021. (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 3/10/2021) Modified on 3/11/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER REGARDING 1/8/21 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER #114 by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Dispute Regarding Protective Order filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC, Meril Life Sciences Pvt, Ltd., and Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 1/27/2021) Modified on 1/28/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Joint Discovery Letter Brief regarding Edwards' Requests for Production of Documents filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Discovery Letter)(Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court takes the pending #107 motion to dismiss filings under submission. The hearing previously scheduled for January 7th at 2:00 p.m. is vacated. The Court will issue a written order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 RESPONSE re #108 Request for Judicial Notice,, by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 REPLY (re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(c) ) filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Request for Judicial Notice re #109 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Edwards' Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit B to Edwards' Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order Granting Edwards' Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #109 ) (Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(c) ) filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carlo F. Van den Bosch ISO Edwards' Opposition, #2 Exhibit A to Van den Bosch Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Van den Bosch Declaration)(Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Request for Judicial Notice re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(c) filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie Mayer, #2 Exhibit 1 - Combined, #3 Exhibit 2 - Premarket Notification 510(k), #4 Exhibit 3 - Meril Webpage, #5 Exhibit 4 - MyVal -THV Presentation, #6 Exhibit 5 - One-year Clinical Outcomes Presentation, #7 Exhibit 6 - Merriam Webster Dictionary, 11th ed, 2019 - definitions, #8 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #107 ) (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(c) filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 12/8/2020. Replies due by 12/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 SCHEDULING ORDER: Close of Fact Discovery due by 9/3/2021; Opening Reports due by 8/6/2021; Rebuttal Reports due by 8/20/2021; Close of Expert Discovery due by 9/7/2021; Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2022 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Jury Selection / Jury Trial (5-day) set for 2/7/2022 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. This order terminates docket no. #105 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/13/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 104 Case Management Conference - Further,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC, Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., and Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Regarding Proposed Case Schedule)(Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 11/10/2020) Modified on 11/12/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephonic Further Case Management Conference held on 11/3/2020. Total Time in Court: 7 Minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Steven Hanle; Carlo Van den Bosch; and Matthew Stephens. Defendant Attorney: J. David Hadden. The Court sets the following deadlines: November 24, 2020-last day for the Defendant to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings; December 17, 2020- opposition is due; December 24, 2020-reply is due; and January 7, 2021 at 2 p.m. for hearing on motion. The Court also sets the following deadlines: November 3, 2020-last day to respond to outstanding discovery request and February 7, 2022-5 day-trial. Parties are directed to meet and confer and e- file within one week from today (November 11th) either a stipulation and proposed order regarding the case schedule or individual proposals setting a case schedule, if there is no agreement. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/3/2020) Modified on 11/5/2020 to correct typos(ndrS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FOR NOVEMBER 3, 2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC, Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., and Meril, Inc.. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/27/2020) Modified on 10/28/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/24/2020 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc., for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 24, 2020 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 CLERK'S NOTICE Re #98 : This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #67 AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: #66 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal is GRANTED; #81 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal is DENIED; #87 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal is GRANTED; #89 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal is GRANTED. Claim Construction Hearing set for 11/6/2020 01:00 PM is VACATED. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2020 02:00 PM. Parties shall file Case Management Statement by no later than 10/27/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER REGARDING #95 9/21/20 JOINT LETTER RE STAYING OF DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/29/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Minute Entry for proceeding held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 9/24/2020. Total Time in Court: 47 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney: Steven Hanle; Carlo Van den Bosch and Matthew Stephens. Defendant Attorney: J. David Hadden; Chieh Tung; and Melanie Mayer. Defendants motion for summary judgment (docket no. #67 ) is argued and submitted by the parties and taken under submission by the Court. Written order to issue. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/24/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Discovery Dispute on Meril's Technical Document Production filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC, Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., and Meril Inc.. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 9/21/2020) Modified on 9/22/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO #67 . Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the motion for summary judgment previously set for September 24th will be held telephonically. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OBJECTIONS to re #90 Reply to Opposition/Response,,,,,, Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-3(d)(1) by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER REGARDING 5/14/20 JOINT LETTER RE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #61 by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 REPLY (re #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; [Corrected] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support CORRECTION OF DOCKET #56 ) filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #2 Exhibit 5 to Mayer Reply Declaration [REDACTED], #3 Exhibit 6 to Mayer Reply Declaration, #4 Exhibit 7 to Mayer Reply Declaration [REDACTED], #5 Exhibit 8 to Mayer Reply Declaration [REDACTED], #6 Exhibit 9 to Mayer Reply Declaration [SEALED], #7 Exhibit 10 to Mayer Reply Declaration [SEALED], #8 Exhibit 11 to Mayer Reply Declaration [SEALED], #9 Exhibit 12 to Mayer Reply Declaration [SEALED], #10 Exhibit 13 to Mayer Reply Declaration, #11 Exhibit 14 to Mayer Reply Declaration, #12 Exhibit 15 to Mayer Reply Declaration [SEALED], #13 Exhibit 16 to Mayer Reply Declaration, #14 Exhibit 17 to Mayer Reply Declaration, #15 Exhibit 18 to Mayer Reply Declaration, #16 Exhibit 19 to Mayer Reply Declaration, #17 Exhibit 20 to Mayer Reply Declaration, #18 Exhibit 21 to Mayer Reply Declaration, #19 Exhibit 22 to Mayer Reply Declaration, #20 Exhibit 23 to Mayer Reply Declaration, #21 Exhibit 24 to Mayer Reply Declaration, #22 Exhibit 25 to Mayer Reply Declaration, #23 Exhibit 26 to Mayer Reply Declaration, #24 Exhibit 27 to Mayer Reply Declaration)(Hadden, J.) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chieh Tung, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 5 to Mayer Reply Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 to Mayer Reply Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 7 to Mayer Reply Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7 to Mayer Reply Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 8 to Mayer Reply Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8 to Mayer Reply Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #11 Sealed Exhibit 9 to Mayer Reply Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #12 Sealed Exhibit 10 to Mayer Reply Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #13 Sealed Exhibit 11 to Mayer Reply Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #14 Sealed Exhibit 12 to Mayer Reply Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #15 Sealed Exhibit 15 to Mayer Reply Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement)(Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. re #87 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Connection with Plaintiff's Opposition to Meril's Summary Judgment Motion (Dkt. 82) (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Connection with Plaintiff's Opposition to Meril's Summary Judgment Motion (Dkt. 82) filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [REDACTED] Plaintiffs Opposition to Merils Summary Judgment Motion, #4 [UNREDACTED] Plaintiffs Opposition to Merils Summary Judgment Motion, #5 [REDACTED] Stephens Declaration ISO Opposition, #6 [UNREDACTED] Stephens Declaration ISO Opposition, #7 [REDACTED] Exhibit D to Stephens Declaration, #8 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit D to Stephens Declaration, #9 [REDACTED] Exhibit 13 to Stephens Declaration, #10 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 13 to Stephens Declaration)(Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #85 Stipulation Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc., Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 8/25/2020) Modified on 8/26/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 EXHIBITS re #81 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal In Connection with Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of NonInfringement and In Conformance to L.R. 75-5(D) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [81-31], [81-32], [81-33], [81-34], [81-35] filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [81-31], #2 Exhibit CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [81-32], #3 Exhibit CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [81-33], #4 Exhibit CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [81-34], #5 Exhibit CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [81-35])(Related document(s) #81 ) (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC re #81 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal In Connection with Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of NonInfringement and In Conformance to L.R. 75-5(D) (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; [Corrected] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support CORRECTION OF DOCKET #56 ) filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit 4, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 22, #21 Exhibit 23, #22 Exhibit 25, #23 Exhibit 26, #24 Exhibit 28, #25 Exhibit 29, #26 Exhibit 34, #27 Exhibit 35, #28 Exhibit 36, #29 Exhibit 37, #30 Exhibit 38, #31 Exhibit 39, #32 Exhibit 40, #33 Exhibit 43, #34 Exhibit 44, #35 Exhibit 47, #36 Exhibit 48, #37 Exhibit 50, #38 Exhibit 51, #39 Exhibit 53, #40 Exhibit 55, #41 Exhibit 57, #42 Exhibit 58, #43 Exhibit 59, #44 Exhibit 66)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal In Connection with Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of NonInfringement and In Conformance to L.R. 75-5(D) filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version - Edwards' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted - Edwards' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Redacted Version - Edwards' Declaration of Matt Stephens ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Unredacted Version - Edwards' Declaration of Matt Stephens ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 10, #8 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 13, #9 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 19, #10 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 21, #11 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 22, #12 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 25, #13 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 23, #14 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 26, #15 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 29, #16 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 36, #17 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 37, #18 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 38, #19 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 40, #20 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 43, #21 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 44, #22 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 47, #23 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 48, #24 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 50, #25 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 51, #26 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 53, #27 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 55, #28 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 57, #29 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 58, #30 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit 59, #31 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit A, #32 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit B, #33 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit C, #34 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit D, #35 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit E, #36 Under Seal MSJ Exhibit K)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 8/21/2020) *** Attachments 31-35 are refiled at Doc #84 *** Modified on 8/25/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance of Michelle LaVoie Wisniewski, filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC (Wisniewski, Michelle) (Filed on 7/31/2020) Modified on 8/3/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance of Gazal June Pour-Moezzi as Counsel, filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC (Pour-Moezzi, Gazal) (Filed on 7/31/2020) Modified on 8/3/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance of Carlo Frank Van den Bosch as Counsel, filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC (Van den Bosch, Carlo) (Filed on 7/31/2020) Modified on 8/3/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying without prejudice #76 Joint Letter.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Discovery Dispute on RFPs 28,29, and 33 - 37, filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards, Meril, Inc., Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Letter Brief)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 7/30/2020) Modified on 7/31/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER REGARDING 7/15/20 JOINT LETTER RE: ESI #72 by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Letter from Steve Hanle to The Honorable Kandis A. Westmore Requesting Telephonic Conference re Submitted Discovery Dispute, dated 07/24/20. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 7/24/2020) Modified on 7/27/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes Re Docket No. #72 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/16/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re ESI Discovery filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING #69 MOTION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING, SETTING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND STAYING CERTAIN DEADLINES.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines/Hearing as to #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non- Infringement, See Docket No. #71 : Responses due by 8/21/2020; Replies due by 9/4/2020; Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #69 MOTION to Change Time for Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement ) filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve Hanle ISO Opposition to Motion, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Steve Hanle, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Steve Hanle)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION to Change Time for Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. Responses due by 6/18/2020. Replies due by 6/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. David Hadden in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Hadden, J.) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; [Corrected] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support CORRECTION OF DOCKET #56 filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 6/15/2020. Replies due by 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Corrected] Declaration of Sanjeev Bhatt in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [56-1], #2 Exhibit AA to Bhatt Declaration, #3 Declaration of Nilay Lad in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment [REDACTED], #4 Exhibit A to Lad Declaration [REDACTED], #5 Exhibit B to Lad Declaration [REDACTED], #6 Exhibit C to Lad Declaration [SEALED], #7 Exhibit D to Lad Declaration [SEALED], #8 Exhibit E to Lad Declaration, #9 Exhibit F to Lad Declaration, #10 Exhibit G to Lad Declaration, #11 Exhibit H to Lad Declaration, #12 Exhibit I to Lad Declaration [SEALED], #13 Exhibit J to Lad Declaration, #14 Exhibit K to Lad Declaration [SEALED], #15 Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #16 Exhibit 1 to Mayer Declaration, #17 Exhibit 2 to Mayer Declaration, #18 Exhibit 3 to Mayer Declaration, #19 Exhibit 4 to Mayer Declaration, #20 Proposed Order)(Hadden, J.) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Connection with Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; [Corrected] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [55-3], #4 Redacted Version of Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; [Corrected] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [55-4], #5 Declaration Unredacted Version of Declaration of Nilay Lad in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #6 Declaration Redacted Version of Declaration of Nilay Lad in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #8 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit A to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #10 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit B to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #11 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit C to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #12 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit D to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #13 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit I to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #14 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit K to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement)(Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Please re-file in its entirety and properly notice the motion Re: #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY; PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. #67 *** MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; [CORRECTED] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support CORRECTION OF DOCKET #56 filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. Responses due by 6/12/2020. Replies due by 6/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Corrected] Declaration of Sanjeev Bhatt in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [56-1])(Hadden, J.) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 6/2/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY; PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. #66 *** Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; [Corrected] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [55-3], #4 Redacted Version of Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; [Corrected] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [55-4])(Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 6/2/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ERRATA re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Joint Letter Brief re Joint Stipulated Protective Order, filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC., Meril, Inc., Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 5/14/2020) Modified on 5/15/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/18/2020 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Joint Statement re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #53 Case Management Scheduling Order by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC, Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 4/24/2020) Modified on 4/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearing as to #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, See Docket No. #59 : Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Hearing re 58 Clerk's Notice, #56 Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.. (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 4/23/2020) Modified on 4/24/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must notice the #56 motion for summary judgment for hearing. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before noticing the motion for a hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY; PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. #67 *** MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. Responses due by 5/6/2020. Replies due by 5/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sanjeev Bhatt in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit AA to Bhatt Declaration, #3 Declaration of Nilay Lad in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit A to Lad Declaration [REDACTED], #5 Exhibit B to Lad Declaration [REDACTED], #6 Exhibit C to Lad Declaration [SEALED], #7 Exhibit D to Lad Declaration [SEALED], #8 Exhibit E to Lad Declaration, #9 Exhibit F to Lad Declaration, #10 Exhibit G to Lad Declaration, #11 Exhibit H to Lad Declaration, #12 Exhibit I to Lad Declaration [SEALED], #13 Exhibit J to Lad Declaration, #14 Exhibit K to Lad Declaration [SEALED], #15 Declaration of Melanie Mayer in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #16 Exhibit 1 to Mayer Declaration, #17 Exhibit 2 to Mayer Declaration, #18 Exhibit 3 to Mayer Declaration, #19 Exhibit 4 to Mayer Declaration, #20 Proposed Order)(Hadden, J.) (Filed on 4/22/2020) Modified on 6/2/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY; PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. #66 *** Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Connection with Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #4 Redacted Version of Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #5 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Nilay Lad in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #6 Redacted Version of Declaration of Nilay Lad in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #8 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit A to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #10 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit B to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #11 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit C to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #12 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit D to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #13 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit I to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #14 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit K to Lad Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement)(Tung, Chieh) (Filed on 4/22/2020) Modified on 6/2/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ANSWER to Amended Complaint; with Demand for Jury Trial, filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 4/20/2020) Modified on 4/21/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motion due by 4/22/2020; Discovery due by 9/17/2020; Motions due by 10/2/2020; Responses due by 10/16/2020; Replies due by 10/23/2020 and Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/6/2020 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/14/20202. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATED CASE SCHEDULE WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 48 Case Management Conference, filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC, Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd, Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Scheduling Order)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 4/10/2020) Modified on 4/12/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, against Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. Filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 4/6/2020) Modified on 4/7/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #49 Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to File First Amended Complaint (Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2)) filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC, Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 4/3/2020) Modified on 4/6/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Initial Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 3/24/2020. Total Time in Court: 18 Minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Mathhew Stephens and Steven Hanle. Defendant Attorney: J. David Hadden and Melanie Mayer. The Court sets the following deadlines: March 30th-deadline for counsel for plaintiff to provide counsel for defendants with their proposed amended complaint; April 3rd-deadline for the filing of a stipulation and proposed order to amend the complaint or a short statement from counsel for defendants that there is no agreement; and April 10th-deadline for the parties to file a stipulation and proposed order regarding a case schedule or statements from each side (2 pages maximum) detailing their proposed schedule. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/24/2020)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the initial case management conference, previously set for March 24, 2020, will be held on that date as a telephonic case management conference before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. at 2:00 p.m. All counsel shall use the following dial-in information to access the call: Dial-In: 888-808-6929 Passcode: 6064255. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #45 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference Hearing to March 24, 2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference Hearing to March 24, 2020 filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. Meril, Inc., and Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Case Management Conference)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 3/5/2020) Modified on 3/5/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for March 3, 2020, is continued to March 10, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 3/2/2020) Modified on 3/3/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #41 Stipulation To Continue Case Management Conference Hearing to March 3, 2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference Hearing to March 3, 2020 filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC., Meril, Inc., and Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Case Management Conference)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 2/19/2020) Modified on 2/20/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANTS #22 MOTION TO DISMISS PATENT INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS.(This order grants docket no. #35 ).(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Hearing, See Docket No. #40 : Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court takes the pending #22 motion to dismiss filings under submission. The hearing and the case management conference previously scheduled for February 13th at 2:00 p.m. are vacated. The Court will issue a written order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying #36 Motion for Leave to File Surreply In Opposition To Defendants Motion To Dismiss Patent Infringement Claims. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Unredacted Documents Sought to be Sealed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 2/6/2020) Modified on 2/7/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Opposition To Defendants Motion To Dismiss Patent Infringement Claims filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Application for Leave to File Surreply, #2 Exhibit B to the Application for Leave to File Surreply, #3 Declaration of Steve Hanle ISO Surreply, #4 Exhibit A of Steve Hanle ISO Surreply, #5 Exhibit B of Steve Hanle ISO Surreply, #6 Exhibit C of Steve Hanle ISO Surreply, #7 Exhibit D of Steve Hanle ISO Surreply, #8 Exhibit E of Steve Hanle ISO Surreply, #9 Exhibit F of Steve Hanle ISO Surreply, #10 Exhibit G of Steve Hanle ISO Surreply, #11 Exhibit H of Steve Hanle ISO Surreply, #12 Exhibit I of Steve Hanle ISO Surreply, #13 Exhibit J of Steve Hanle ISO Surreply, #14 Proposed Order Granting Application for Leave to File Surreply)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal In Conformance with L.R. 79-5(D) filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Edwards' Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #4 Unredacted Version of Edwards' Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A To Edwards Surreply, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C To Edwards Surreply, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E To Edwards Surreply, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F To Edwards Surreply, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G To Edwards Surreply, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H To Edwards Surreply)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 2/6/2020) Modified on 2/7/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the initial case management conference, previously set for January 21, 2020 and the hearing on the #22 motion to dismiss, previously set for January 30, 2020, are continued to February 13, 2020 before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC., and Meril, Inc., and Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 1/14/2020) Modified on 1/15/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE re #27 Request for Judicial Notice, #26 Opposition/Response to Motion by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hadden, J.) (Filed on 12/18/2019) Modified on 12/19/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Patent Infringement Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Please be sure the Court's location is correctly reflected as the OAKLAND DIVISION, not San Francisco. No further action is necessary. Re: #27 Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC, #26 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Request for Judicial Notice re #26 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Dismiss Patent Infringement Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6 filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Granting Request for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Patent Infringement Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Hanle ISO Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Steven Hanle, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of Steven Hanle, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of Steven Hanle)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Melanie L. Mayer. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Renotice motion hearing re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Patent Infringement Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byMeril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file the #22 motion to dismiss. Hearing date of January 16th, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. January 16th was not the Court's next available hearing date when this motion was e-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Hearing as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss, See Docket No. #24 : Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Patent Infringement Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 12/11/2019. Replies due by 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hadden, J.) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Melanie L. Mayer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13923265.) filed by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mayer, Melanie) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Meril Life Sciences Private Limited for Meril, Inc.; Corporate Parent Micro Life Sciences Private Limited, Corporate Parent Bilakhia Holdings Private Limited for Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd.. (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION to Extend Time To Respond to Complaint [L.R. 6-1(a)] filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. Meril, Inc. and Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 11/7/2019) Modified on 11/8/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC re 17 Clerk's Notice,, #14 Order Reassigning Case,, Case Assigned/Reassigned, and Standing Order for Civil Cases Before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for January 21, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by January 14th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-06593-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC , as to Meril, Inc. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC , as to Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 10/22/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC.. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC as to Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error Re: #8 Proposed Summons filed by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation Edwards Lifesciences LLC. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office as th ere is currently a summons outstanding (see doc no. #6 ). If counsel wishes to have a new summons issued, the outstanding summons must first be returned using <<<< (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/28/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., Meril, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13790167.). Filed byEdwards Lifesciences Corporation, Edwards Lifesciences LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 to Complaint, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanle, Steven) (Filed on 10/14/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards Lifesciences Corporation et al v. Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwards Lifesciences Corporation
Represented By: Steven Mark Hanle
Represented By: Matthew Robert Stephens
Represented By: Carlo Frank Van den Bosch
Represented By: Gazal June Pour-Moezzi
Represented By: Michelle LaVoie Wisniewski
Represented By: Adam Rolando Aquino
Represented By: Anne-Marie D. Dao
Represented By: Brian C. Horne
Represented By: Christy Green Lea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwards Lifesciences LLC
Represented By: Steven Mark Hanle
Represented By: Matthew Robert Stephens
Represented By: Carlo Frank Van den Bosch
Represented By: Gazal June Pour-Moezzi
Represented By: Michelle LaVoie Wisniewski
Represented By: Adam Rolando Aquino
Represented By: Anne-Marie D. Dao
Represented By: Brian C. Horne
Represented By: Christy Green Lea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meril, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie Mayer
Represented By: J. David Hadden
Represented By: Chieh Tung
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Ware
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas McMichael
Represented By: Michelle Erica Irwin
Represented By: Sapna S. Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd.
Represented By: Melanie Mayer
Represented By: J. David Hadden
Represented By: Chieh Tung
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Ware
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas McMichael
Represented By: Michelle Erica Irwin
Represented By: Sapna S. Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?