Ross v. AT&T Mobility, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Ross
Defendant: AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, One Touch Direct LLC and One Touch Direct-San Antonio LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv06669
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 118 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2021 by Zoom video conference re #100 Amended Joint Discovery Letter Brief. See minute Order for all particulars. ***Motions terminated: #100 Amended Joint Discovery Letter Brief.Recorded in Zoom: 2:05-2:25. Attachment: Civil Law and Motion Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2021)
August 25, 2021 Filing 117 RESPONSE re 116 Order,, by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER: In the joint discovery letter set for hearing on August 26, 2021, the parties dispute the scope of Defendant's document production pursuant to Plaintiff's RFP No. 1. However, the text of RFP No. 1 is not included in the parties' papers. The parties shall file the text of RFP No. by no later than 10:00 a.m. PST on August 25, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/24/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 115 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Hearing on #100 Amended Joint Discovery Letter Brief is set for 8/26/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Pe rsons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry .) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
July 21, 2021 Filing 114 CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the hearing on joint discovery letter #100 , currently set for July 22, 2021, is vacated. The court will hold a hearing on the joint letter on August 26, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 113 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Hearing on #100 Joint Discovery Letter Brief is set for 7/22/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons gr anted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)< /i< (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 6, 2021 Filing 112 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A Settlement Conference is hereby set for September 30, 2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. A Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference call with counsel only is set for September 27, 2021 10:00 AM. The parties shall comply with Judge DeMarchi's Standing Order re Settlement Conference Procedures at http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vkdorders, which includes instructions and deadlines for the submission of Settlement Conference Statements and Confidential Settlement Letters in advance of the conference. Conference Call and Zoom information will be emailed to counsel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Settlement Conference set for 9/30/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. Telephone Conference set for 9/27/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Telephonic Only before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
June 29, 2021 Filing 111 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/29/2021. Hearing held via Zoom videoconference. Matter referred for settlement. No further dates set.Total Time in Court: 3 minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Brian R. England. Defendant Attorney: Counsel for Defendants One Touch Direct, LLC and OneTouch Direct San Antonio LLC: Alissa Pleau-Fuller; Counsel for Defendant AT&T Mobility: Ashley Johnson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/29/2021)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 29, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 29, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 28, 2021 Filing 109 STIPULATION re #104 Order, Set Deadlines, #107 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC, One Touch Direct, LLC, OneTouch Direct San Antonio, LLC and Robert Ross. (Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 6/28/2021) Modified on 6/29/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2021 Filing 108 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be i dentified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than June 28, 2021 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/2 9/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT LIST RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MAGISTRATE JUDGES by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #105 Motion for Extension of Time to File. List of Magistrates due by 6/28/2021.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 106 Proposed Order re #105 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Settlement Conference Order and Case Management Conference [CORRECTED VERSION] by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 105 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Settlement Conference Order and Case Management Conference filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC, One Touch Direct, LLC, One Touch Direct San Antonio, LLC and Robert Ross. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2021) Modified on 6/21/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Joint List due by 6/21/2021. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 17, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 16, 2021 Filing 103 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be i dentified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than June 21, 2021 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/22 /2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2021)
June 15, 2021 Filing 102 Joint Updated CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by One Touch Direct LLC, One Touch Direct-San Antonio LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC and Robert Ross. (Pleau-Fuller, Alissa) (Filed on 6/15/2021) Modified on 6/16/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2021 Filing 101 CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are notified that the court will hold a hearing on Joint Discovery Letter #100 on July 22, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 100 Amended Letter Brief by Robert Ross re #99 Letter Brief (Grivakes, Chris) (Filed on 5/20/2021) Modified on 5/21/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2021 Filing 99 Letter Brief to Magistrate filed byRobert Ross. (Grivakes, Chris) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 98 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter to Magistrate filed by Robert Ross, and AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grivakes, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Joint Letter (Exh. 1 to Grivakes Decl), #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Joint Letter (Exh 2 to Grivakes Decl))(Grivakes, Chris) (Filed on 5/17/2021) Modified on 5/18/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #88 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying #89 Discovery Letter Brief without prejudice. Any updated joint discovery letter on these disputes is due by May 17, 2021. (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/1/2022. Close of Fact Discovery due by 12/23/2021. Designation of Experts due by 1/6/2022. Dispositive Motion due by 3/29/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/15/2022. Rebuttal Reports due by 2/10/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Jury Selection set for 8/15/2022 - 8/30/2022 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 21, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/20/2021. Hearing held via Zoom videoconference. Further case management conference set. Written order to issue. Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined.Total Time in Court: 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Not reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Damion Robinson. Defendant Attorney: Alissa Pleau-Fuller; Ashley Johnson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/20/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 93 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be i dentified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names and email must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 19, 2021 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - V ideoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 92 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC and Robert Ross. (Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 4/13/2021) Modified on 4/14/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2021 Filing 91 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Pleau-Fuller, Alissa) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 90 Declaration of Ashley Johnson in Support of #88 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter to Magistrate filed byAT&T Mobility, LLC. (Related document(s) #88 ) (Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 89 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Robert Ross and AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Version of Discovery in Dispute)(Grivakes, Chris) (Filed on 3/23/2021) Modified on 3/24/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2021 Filing 88 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Letter Brief to Magistrate filed by Robert Ross and AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grivakes, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1)(Grivakes, Chris) (Filed on 3/23/2021) Modified on 3/24/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #86 Stipulated Request to Add One Touch Direct, LLC and One Touch Direct - San Antonio LLC to the Protective Order.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 16, 2021 Filing 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER and Request to Add One Touch Direct, LLC and One Touch Direct - San Antonio LLC to the Protective Order filed by One Touch Direct LLC, One Touch Direct-San Antonio LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC and Robert Ross. (Pleau-Fuller, Alissa) (Filed on 3/16/2021) Modified on 3/17/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #84 Stipulation to Continue Trial and Other Related Dates in the Scheduling Order. Close of Expert Discovery due by 9/14/2021. Close of Fact Discovery due by 7/8/2021. Designation of Experts due by 7/22/2021. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 8/26/2021. Dispositive Motion due by 10/12/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Jury Selection set for 2/28/2022 - 3/15/2022 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
February 8, 2021 Filing 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Trial and Other Related Dates in the Scheduling Order re #42 Order,, filed by One Touch Direct LLC, One Touch Direct-San Antonio LLC, AT&T Mobility, LLC and Robert Ross. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alissa Pleau-Fuller, #2 Proposed Order)(Collins, Kevin) (Filed on 2/8/2021) Modified on 2/9/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials JST immediately after the case number. Re: #83 C ertificate of Interested Entities,, filed by One Touch Direct LLC, One Touch Direct-San Antonio LLC, #82 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by One Touch Direct LLC, One Touch Direct-San Antonio LLC (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 83 Certificate of Interested Entities by One Touch Direct LLC, One Touch Direct-San Antonio LLC identifying Other Affiliate Robert Ross, Other Affiliate AT&T Mobility LLC, Other Affiliate OneTouch Direct - San Antonio, LLC, Other Affiliate Mole Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Reed Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Inteliservices, Inc., Other Affiliate OTD Holding Company, Inc. for One Touch Direct LLC; Other Affiliate Robert Ross, Other Affiliate AT&T Mobility LLC for One Touch Direct-San Antonio LLC. (Pleau-Fuller, Alissa) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 82 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial byOne Touch Direct LLC, One Touch Direct-San Antonio LLC. (Pleau-Fuller, Alissa) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 81 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAT&T Mobility, LLC. (Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEThe Court having reviewed the parties' most recent case management statement, ECF No. 79, and it appearing that there currently are no matters requiring the Court's attention, the case management conference scheduled for January 12, 2021 is CONTINUED to April 20, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. An updated joint case management statement is due April 13, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 79 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC and Robert Ross. (Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 1/5/2021) Modified on 1/6/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar Granting #77 Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 30, 2020 Filing 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Answer First Amended Complaint filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC, Robert Ross. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Stipulation to Extend Time, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 12/30/2020) Modified on 12/30/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2020 Filing 76 Summons Issued as to One Touch Direct LLC, One Touch Direct-San Antonio LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 75 ERRATA re #71 Amended Complaint by Robert Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grivakes, Chris) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 74 ERRATA re #71 Amended Complaint by Robert Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grivakes, Chris) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 73 Proposed Summons. (Grivakes, Chris) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 72 Proposed Summons. (Grivakes, Chris) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 71 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byRobert Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Grivakes, Chris) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 70 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be i dentified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel for all parties must be sent in one mail to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than January 11, 2020 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2021 02 :00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #58 Motion to Amend/Correct. Amended Pleadings due by 12/25/2020.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2020 is CONTINUED. Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2021 02:00 PM in Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 67 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2020 02:00 PM in Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 26, 2020 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2020 02:00 PM in Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 66 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC and Robert Ross. (McRae, Marcellus) (Filed on 10/16/2020) Modified on 10/16/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #60 MOTION to Amend/Correct #58 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #58 filed by Robert Ross. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 6, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 64 REPLY (re #60 MOTION to Amend/Correct #58 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #58 ) filed byRobert Ross. (Grivakes, Chris) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 63 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #60 MOTION to Amend/Correct #58 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #58 , #58 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint ) filed byAT&T Mobility, LLC. (McRae, Marcellus) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND EXTENDING DATE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #61 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 40 Case Management Conference - Initial,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC and Robert Ross. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley E. Johnson, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 9/4/2020) Modified on 9/8/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION to Amend/Correct [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #58 #58 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Robert Ross. Responses due by 9/14/2020. Replies due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Grivakes, Chris) (Filed on 8/29/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2020 Filing 59 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. The motion hearing previously set for 9/30/2020 is CONTINUED due to being set on a date that is closed to further settings. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #58 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (Related documents(s) #58 )(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Robert Ross. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/8/2020. Replies due by 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Grivakes, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Grivakes, Chris) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #56 Stipulation for Protective Order [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT]. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC and Robert Ross. (Attachments: #1 Redline Against Model Order, #2 Declaration of Ashley E. Johnson in support of changes to model protective order)(Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 6/22/2020) Modified on 6/23/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' dispute over the scope of the protective order #49 , the court adopts Defendant's proposal to include an Attorneys' Eyes Only provision. Now that the court has ruled on this issue, the parties shall meet and confer and jointly draft a proposed protective order and submit it for the court's review by June 22, 2020. The parties shall also file an accompanying declaration that complies with Judge Ryu's Standing Order (section 15). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/15/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Notice of Reference and ORDER Re: Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/15/2020. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint byAT&T Mobility, LLC. (Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RECUSAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 1, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 1, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATED ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #48 Stipulation.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Submission of Proposed Protective Orders by AT&T Mobility, LLC and Robert Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AT&T Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - AT&T Redline Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C - Ross Proposed Protective Order, #4 Exhibit D - Ross Redline Protective Order)(Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 6/1/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2020 Filing 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding ESI Order filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC and Robert Ross. (Attachments: #1 Redline Against ESI Model Order)(Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 6/1/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2020 Filing 47 STIPULATION Regarding Mediation and Pre-Mediation Discovery filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC and Robert Ross. (Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 6/1/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2020 Filing 46 STIPULATION to Extend Time To Respond To Complaint filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC and Robert Ross. (McRae, Marcellus) (Filed on 5/23/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Andrew Emilio Calderon (Calderon, Andrew) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by John Mark Pierce (Pierce, John) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #39 Motion to Substitute Attorney..(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Close of Expert Discovery due by 6/16/2021. Close of Fact Discovery due by 4/9/2021. Designation of Experts due by 4 /23/2021. Dispositive Motion due by 7/14/2021. Rebuttal Reports due by 5/28/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/29/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Jury Trial set for 11/29/2021 - 12/14/2021 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 19, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/19/2020. Hearing held via Zoom. The parties are ordered to meet and confer about, and make a joint proposal regarding, the discovery schedule, and formal or informal discovery that must be exchanged immediately among the parties to make mediation productive. If the parties are unable to agree, they must submit competing proposals. In the latter event, the Court will endeavor to choose, in all respects, the single proposal it concludes is most reasonable. Written case scheduling order to issue. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 5/29/2020. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor.Total Time in Court: 22 minutes. Court Reporter: Not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Grivakes. Defendant Attorney: Marcellus McRae, Ashley Johnson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Robert Ross. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Damion) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MAY 19, 2020. This link is for public use only; the parties will receive personal invites to attend the hearing. Please use the options below to access the hearing. Important: Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Zoom webinar: When: May 19, 2020 02:00 PM Pacific Time (US and Canada)Topic: Ross v. AT&T Mobility, LLC Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/85955753544?pwd=bWNGNENqTXFseUhVTkxVMTZiVHFsUT09Password: 671221 Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 Webinar ID: 859 5575 3544 Password: 671221 (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 37 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than May 18, 2020 by 2:00 PM.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.For important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entr y generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part #16 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Complaint due by 6/4/2020.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 35 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order on Behalf of All Parties filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC and Robert Ross. (McRae, Marcellus) (Filed on 5/12/2020) Modified on 5/13/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Per Local Rule 5-1(c)(2)(E) a motion and proposed order is required for this substitution. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #34 Notice of Change In Co unsel filed by Robert Ross (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Damion D. Robinson (Robinson, Damion) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to General Order 72, the case management conference currently scheduled for May 19, 2020, will proceed telephonically. No party need submit a request for telephonic appearance. Not later than 24 hours before the conference, the parties are ordered to email the courtroom deputy a conference call number at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov. All counsel and/or parties representing themselves must be on the line at 2:00 p.m., ready to proceed when called. The Court usually schedules more than one case management conference at the same time, and thanks the parties and counsel in advance for their patience. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by John Mark Pierce (Pierce, John) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by John Mark Pierce (Pierce, John) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Thomas David Warren (Warren, Thomas) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEOn the Court's own motion, the case management conference scheduled for March 24, 2020 is continued to May 19, 2020. An updated case management statement is due May 12, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Per Order 29 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order on Behalf of All Parties filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC and Robert Ross. (McRae, Marcellus) (Filed on 3/17/2020) Modified on 3/18/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2020 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Pursuant to General Order 72, the case management conference currently scheduled for March 24, 2020, will proceed telephonically. No party need submit a request for telephonic appearance. Not later than 24 hours before the conference, the parties are ordered to email the courtroom deputy a conference call number at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov. All counsel and/or parties representing themselves must be on the line at 2:00 p.m., ready to proceed when called. The Court usually schedules more than one case management conference at the same time, and thanks the parties and counsel in advance for their patience. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sam, Dwayne) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McRae, Marcellus) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 24 Request for Judicial Notice re #16 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byAT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #16 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 3, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byAT&T Mobility, LLC. (McRae, Marcellus) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byRobert Ross. (Warren, Thomas) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 30, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14024924.) filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Ashley) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS 12(B)(6) MOTION AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS 12(B)(6) MOTION. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #16 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof , #16 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Responses due by 1/8/2020. Replies due by 1/22/2020. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 13, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #16 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Robert Ross and AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dwayne D. Sam, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Warren, Thomas) (Filed on 12/13/2019) Modified on 12/13/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/20/2019. Replies due by 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McRae, Marcellus) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by AT&T Mobility, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Mobility, LLC. (McRae, Marcellus) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Judge's initials are incorrect. The correct Initials for Judge Jon S. Tigar is JST not LB. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should referenc e the correct judge's initials moving forward on future filings. No further action is necessary Re: #14 Stipulation filed by Robert Ross, AT&T Mobility, LLC (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC., Robert Ross (McRae, Marcellus) (Filed on 11/5/2019) Modified on 11/6/2019 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2020 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2020 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Ross.. (Warren, Thomas) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Ross. AT&T Mobility, LLC served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Warren, Thomas) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Dwayne D. Sam representing Plaintiff. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13812102.) filed by Robert Ross. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sam, Dwayne) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/1/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Emilio Calderon (Calderon, Andrew) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Warren, Thomas) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13802025.). Filed by Robert Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Ross CLRA Affidavit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warren, Thomas) (Filed on 10/17/2019) Modified on 11/5/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. AT&T Mobility, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Represented By: Marcellus Antonio McRae
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Touch Direct LLC
Represented By: Alissa Renee Pleau-Fuller
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Touch Direct-San Antonio LLC
Represented By: Alissa Renee Pleau-Fuller
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ross
Represented By: Andrew Emilio Calderon
Represented By: Thomas David Warren
Represented By: Dwayne D Sam
Represented By: John Mark Pierce
Represented By: Damion D. Robinson
Represented By: Chris Grivakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?